Jennifer Glass, et al v. Ken Paxton, et al

Amicus Curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS, STUDENTS FOR CONCEALED CARRY FOUNDATION, GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE and STUDENTS FOR CONCEALED CARRY
Defendant / Appellee: ALEX M. CRANBERG, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents, ERNEST ALISEDA, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents, DAVID J. BECK, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents, WALLACE L. HALL, JR., in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents, JEFFREY D. HILDEBRAND, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents, SARA MARTINEZ TUCKER, in her official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents, GREGORY L. FENVES, in his official capacity as President, University of Texas, PAUL L. FOSTER, JR., in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents, KEN PAXTON, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Texas, R. STEVEN HICKS, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents and BRENDA PEJOVICH, in her official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Plaintiff / Appellant: DOCTOR JENNIFER LYNN GLASS, DOCTOR MIA CARTER and DOCTOR LISA MOORE
Case Number: 17-50641
Filed: July 26, 2017
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Ann Marie Mackin is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with the Texas Attorney General's office. [17-50641] (PAC) [Entered: 10/24/2018 01:33 PM]
September 7, 2018 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate issue date satisfied. [17-50641] (SBS) [Entered: 09/07/2018 09:28 AM]
August 16, 2018 JUDGMENT ENTERED AND FILED. Costs Taxed Against: Plaintiffs-Appellants. [17-50641] (DTG) [Entered: 08/16/2018 04:12 PM]
August 16, 2018 PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [17-50641 Affirmed ] Judge: CDK , Judge: LHS , Judge: JCH. Mandate issue date is 09/07/2018 [17-50641] (DTG) [Entered: 08/16/2018 04:08 PM]
July 27, 2018 Paper copies of Appellant Supplement Brief filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-50641] (SBS)
July 24, 2018 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr., Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Ken Paxton, Ms. Brenda Pejovich and Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker (J. LaFond) to the 28j Letter filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 [ # 8832295-2 ] Date of Service: 07/24/2018 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Lifland, Long, Merrill, Nisenson, Ratiu, Skaggs; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Jason R. LaFond )
July 23, 2018 APPELLANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED . # of Copies Provided: 0 Miscellaneous deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 07/30/2018 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore. [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF FILED by Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore. Date of service: 07/23/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill, Ratiu; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
July 23, 2018 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore Date of Service: 07/23/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill, Ratiu; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
July 11, 2018 ORAL ARGUMENT HEARD before Judges King, Southwick, Ho. Arguing Person Information Updated for: Renea Hicks arguing for Appellant Mia Carter, Appellant Jennifer Lynn Glass AND Appellant Lisa Moore; Arguing Person Information Updated for: Jason R. LaFond arguing for Appellee Ernest Aliseda, Appellee David J. Beck, Appellee Alex M. Cranberg, Appellee Gregory L. Fenves, Appellee Paul L. Foster, Jr., Appellee Wallace L. Hall, Jr., Appellee R. Steven Hicks, Appellee Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Appellee Ken Paxton, Appellee Brenda Pejovich AND Appellee Sara Martinez Tucker [17-50641] (KMP)
July 2, 2018 COURT ORDER granting motion to file supplemental briefs filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter [ # 8813754-2 ] [17-50641] (PAC)
July 2, 2018 RESPONSE filed by Appellees Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr., Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Ken Paxton, Ms. Brenda Pejovich and Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker (J. LaFond to the 28j Letter filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 [ # 8813743-2 ] Date of Service: 07/02/2018 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Lifland, Long, Merrill, Nisenson, Ratiu, Skaggs; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks; US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Nisenson, Skaggs [17-50641] (Jason R. LaFond )
July 2, 2018 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr., Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Ken Paxton, Ms. Brenda Pejovich and Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker (J. LaFond [8814727-1] to the Motion to file supplemental briefs filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 [ # 8813754-2 ] Date of Service: 07/02/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill, Ratiu; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks. [17-50641] (Jason R. LaFond )
July 2, 2018 RESPONSE DUE to Motion to file supplemental briefs filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 [ # 8813754-2 ] Response/Opposition due on 07/09/2018 [17-50641] (PAC)
June 29, 2018 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore to file supplemental briefs [8813754-2]Supplemental Briefs Included? No. Date of service: 06/29/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill, Ratiu; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
June 29, 2018 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore Date of Service: 06/29/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill, Ratiu; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
June 26, 2018 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore to the 28j Letter filed by Appellees Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker, Mr. Ken Paxton, Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr. and Ms. Brenda Pejovich in 17-50641 [ # 8809713-2 ] Date of Service: 06/26/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill, Ratiu; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
June 26, 2018 RESPONSE filed by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore to the 28j Letter filed by Appellees Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker, Mr. Ken Paxton, Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr. and Ms. Brenda Pejovich in 17-50641 [ # 8804348-2 ] Date of Service: 06/26/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill, Ratiu; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
June 26, 2018 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellees Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr., Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Ken Paxton, Ms. Brenda Pejovich and Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker (J. LaFond) Date of Service: 06/26/2018 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Lifland, Long, Merrill, Nisenson, Ratiu, Skaggs; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Jason R. LaFond )
June 20, 2018 SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28j) FILED by Appellees Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr., Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Ken Paxton, Ms. Brenda Pejovich and Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker (J. LaFond Date of Service: 06/20/2018 via email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Lifland, Long, Merrill, Nisenson, Ratiu, Skaggs; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Jason R. LaFond )
May 22, 2018 CASE CALENDARED for oral argument on Wednesday, 07/11/2018 in New Orleans in the En Banc Courtroom -- AM session. In accordance with our policy, lead counsel only will receive via email at a later date a copy of the court's docket and an acknowledgment form. All other counsel of record should monitor the court's website for the posting of the oral argument calendars.. [17-50641] (KMP)
May 14, 2018 CASE TENTATIVELY calendared for oral argument for the week of 07/09/2018. [17-50641] (GAM)
February 21, 2018 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by Students for Concealed Carry, Students for Concealed Carry Foundation and Amici Curiae Students for Concealed Carry and Students for Concealed Carry Foundation in 17-50641 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-50641] (NFD)
February 12, 2018 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Students for Concealed Carry and Students for Concealed Carry Foundation in 17-50641 [ # 8690915-2 ] Date of service: 02/12/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill, Ratiu; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Victor Ratiu )
February 8, 2018 Paper copies of Appellant Reply Brief filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-50641] (NFD)
February 6, 2018 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Victor Ratiu for Amicus Curiae Students for Concealed Carry Foundation in 17-50641, Attorney Victor Ratiu for Amicus Curiae Students for Concealed Carry in 17-50641 [17-50641] (PAC)
February 5, 2018 APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 02/12/2018 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore. [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore. Date of service: 02/05/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Roger James George Jr.)
February 1, 2018 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-50641] (Victor Ratiu )
January 31, 2018 is advised to resubmit an appearance form. Reason: The revised Notice of Appearance Form must be used. [17-50641] (BF)
January 29, 2018 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-50641] (Victor Ratiu )
January 29, 2018 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by Victor Ratiu. Date of service: 01/29/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Victor Ratiu )
January 26, 2018 Paper copies of Appellee Brief filed by Appellees Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker, Mr. Ken Paxton, Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr. and Ms. Brenda Pejovich in 17-50641 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-50641] (NFD)
January 22, 2018 APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 01/29/2018 for Appellees Ernest Aliseda, David J. Beck, Alex M. Cranberg, Gregory L. Fenves, Paul L. Foster Jr., Wallace L. Hall Jr., R. Steven Hicks, Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Ken Paxton, Brenda Pejovich and Sara Martinez Tucker.. Reply Brief due on 02/05/2018 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr., Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Ken Paxton, Ms. Brenda Pejovich and Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker. Brief for Appellees Date of service: 01/22/2018 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Jason R. LaFond )
December 14, 2017 Paper copies of Amicus Brief filed by AAUP, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence and Amici Curiae AAUP, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence and Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 17-50641 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-50641] (NFD)
December 11, 2017 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by AAUP, Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence and Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence in 17-50641 [ # 8643303-2 ] Date of service: 12/11/2017 via US mail - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Goetz, Lieberwitz, Long, Nisenson, Skaggs; email - Attorney for Amici Curiae: Lifland, Merrill; Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Cynthia Ann Merrill )
November 29, 2017 CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellees' brief filed by Appellees Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker, Mr. Ken Paxton, Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr. and Ms. Brenda Pejovich [ # 8647548-2 ] Appellee's Brief due on 01/22/2018 for Appellees Ernest Aliseda, David J. Beck, Alex M. Cranberg, Gregory L. Fenves, Paul L. Foster Jr., Wallace L. Hall Jr., R. Steven Hicks, Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Ken Paxton, Brenda Pejovich and Sara Martinez Tucker [17-50641] (CMB)
November 28, 2017 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellees Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr., Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Ken Paxton, Ms. Brenda Pejovich and Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker to extend time to file brief of appellees 40 days, until 01/22/2018 [8647548-2]. Date of service: 11/28/2017 [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellees Mr. Ernest Aliseda, Mr. David J. Beck, Mr. Alex M. Cranberg, Mr. Gregory L. Fenves, Mr. Paul L. Foster, Jr., Mr. Wallace L. Hall, Jr., Mr. R. Steven Hicks, Mr. Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Mr. Ken Paxton, Ms. Brenda Pejovich and Ms. Sara Martinez Tucker for filing Unopposed MET to File Appellees' Brief until 01/22/2018 at 11:59 pm. [17-50641] (Jason R. LaFond )
November 28, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Charles C. Lifland for party(s) Amicus Curiae AAUP Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence Amicus Curiae Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, in case 17-50641 [17-50641] (NFD)
November 28, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Cynthia Ann Merrill for party(s) Amicus Curiae AAUP Amicus Curiae Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence Amicus Curiae Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, in case 17-50641 [17-50641] (NFD)
November 21, 2017 Paper copies of record excerpts filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [17-50641] (NFD)
November 21, 2017 Paper copies of appellant brief filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [17-50641] (NFD)
November 20, 2017 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF FILED by American Association of University Professors, Giffords Law Center to Prevent Gun Violence, and Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence. Date of service: 11/20/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Cynthia Ann Merrill )
November 20, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM of Charles C. Lifland for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-50641] (Charles C. Lifland )
November 20, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM of Cynthia A. Merrill for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-50641] (Cynthia Ann Merrill )
November 16, 2017 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 [ # 8638146-2 ] Date of service: 11/16/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
November 15, 2017 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 [ # 8638147-2 ] Date of service: 11/15/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
November 15, 2017 LETTER filed referencing letter filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter in 17-50641 [8639413-2]. Brief filed on 11-13-2017 replaced with corrected brief. [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: LETTER filed by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore Date of Service: 11/15/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
November 13, 2017 SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 11/22/2017 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore. [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require: Tab pages. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 11/29/2017 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore. Date of service: 11/13/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
November 13, 2017 SUFFICIENT APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 11/22/2017 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore. [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED. Additionally the Brief requires Statement of the Issue to be double spaced. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 11/29/2017 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore. Appellee's Brief due on 12/13/2017 for Appellees Ernest Aliseda, David J. Beck, Alex M. Cranberg, Gregory L. Fenves, Paul L. Foster Jr., Wallace L. Hall Jr., R. Steven Hicks, Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, Ken Paxton, Brenda Pejovich and Sara Martinez Tucker [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore. Date of service: 11/13/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellants: George, Greenstein, Hicks; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, LaFond, Mackin, Nimocks [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
November 9, 2017 CLERK ORDER granting motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellants Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter [ # 8635641-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/13/2017 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore [17-50641] (MBC)
November 8, 2017 UNOPPOSED MOTION to extend time to file brief as appellant until 11/13/2017 [8635641-2]. [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore for filing Appellant's Opening Brief until 11/13/2017 at 10:00 pm. [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
September 19, 2017 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore. Extension Granted to and including 11/09/2017. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 11/09/2017 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore [17-50641] (RSM)
September 18, 2017 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore for filing Appellants' Opening Brief until 11/09/2017 at 11:00 pm. [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
September 13, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Anne Marie Mackin for party(s) Appellee Wallace L. Hall Jr. Appellee Sara Martinez Tucker Appellee Ernest Aliseda Appellee Brenda Pejovich Appellee Gregory L. Fenves Appellee Paul L. Foster Jr. Appellee David J. Beck Appellee Alex M. Cranberg Appellee R. Steven Hicks Appellee Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, in case 17-50641 [17-50641] (CAS)
September 8, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM Anne Marie Mackin for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-50641] (Anne Marie Mackin )
August 30, 2017 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/10/2017 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore. [17-50641] (MRB)
August 30, 2017 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [17-50641] (MRB)
August 29, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Malcolm Nathan Greenstein for party(s) Appellant Lisa Moore Appellant Mia Carter Appellant Jennifer Lynn Glass, in case 17-50641 [17-50641] (SDH)
August 24, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-50641] (Malcolm Nathan Greenstein )
August 15, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jason R. LaFond for party(s) Appellee Wallace L. Hall Jr. Appellee Sara Martinez Tucker Appellee Ernest Aliseda Appellee Brenda Pejovich Appellee Gregory L. Fenves Appellee Ken Paxton Appellee Paul L. Foster Jr. Appellee David J. Beck Appellee Alex M. Cranberg Appellee R. Steven Hicks Appellee Jeffrey D. Hildebrand, in case 17-50641 [17-50641] (MBC)
August 10, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM J. LaFond for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-50641] (Jason R. LaFond )
August 8, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Renea Hicks for party(s) Appellant Lisa Moore Appellant Mia Carter Appellant Jennifer Lynn Glass, in case 17-50641 [17-50641] (NFD)
August 7, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Roger James George Jr. for Appellant Mia Carter in 17-50641, Attorney Roger James George Jr. for Appellant Lisa Moore in 17-50641, Attorney Roger James George Jr. for Appellant Jennifer Lynn Glass in 17-50641 [17-50641] (MAS)
August 7, 2017 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:16-CV-845. Electronic ROA due on 08/22/2017. [17-50641] (CMB)
August 4, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [17-50641] (Renea Hicks )
August 3, 2017 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [17-50641] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 08/03/2017 via email - Attorney for Appellant: George; Attorney for Appellees: Cochran-McCall, Nimocks [17-50641] (Roger James George Jr.)
August 3, 2017 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Roger James George, Jr. for Ms. Lisa Moore, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Mia Carter for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [17-50641] (Roger James George Jr.)
August 1, 2017 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8556573-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 08/16/2017 for Appellants Mia Carter, Jennifer Lynn Glass and Lisa Moore [17-50641] (RAJ)
July 26, 2017 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Mia Carter, Ms. Jennifer Lynn Glass and Ms. Lisa Moore [17-50641] (RAJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jennifer Glass, et al v. Ken Paxton, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland Esq.
Represented By: Mariel Goetz
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Merrill Ph. D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF UNIVERSITY PROFESSORS
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland Esq.
Represented By: Risa Lieberwitz
Represented By: Nancy Long
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Merrill Ph. D.
Represented By: Aaron Nisenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STUDENTS FOR CONCEALED CARRY FOUNDATION
Represented By: Victor Ratiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: GIFFORDS LAW CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Represented By: Charles C. Lifland Esq.
Represented By: J. Adam Skaggs
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Merrill Ph. D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: STUDENTS FOR CONCEALED CARRY
Represented By: Victor Ratiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ALEX M. CRANBERG, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ERNEST ALISEDA, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID J. BECK, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALLACE L. HALL, JR., in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JEFFREY D. HILDEBRAND, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SARA MARTINEZ TUCKER, in her official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: GREGORY L. FENVES, in his official capacity as President, University of Texas
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PAUL L. FOSTER, JR., in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEN PAXTON, in his official capacity as Attorney General of Texas
Represented By: David Austin Robert Nimocks
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: R. STEVEN HICKS, in his official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BRENDA PEJOVICH, in her official capacity as a member of the University of Texas Board of Regents
Represented By: Jason R. LaFond
Represented By: Amanda Cochran-McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOCTOR JENNIFER LYNN GLASS
Represented By: Renea Hicks
Represented By: Malcolm Nathan Greenstein
Represented By: Roger James George Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOCTOR MIA CARTER
Represented By: Renea Hicks
Represented By: Malcolm Nathan Greenstein
Represented By: Roger James George Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DOCTOR LISA MOORE
Represented By: Renea Hicks
Represented By: Malcolm Nathan Greenstein
Represented By: Roger James George Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?