Traesey Horton v. Austrilis Oil and Gas
Defendant / Appellee: AUSTRILIS OIL AND GAS
Plaintiff / Appellant: TRAESEY L. HORTON, also known as Tracy L. Horton
Case Number: 18-60508
Filed: July 18, 2018
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 PROPOSED SUFFICIENT RECORD EXCERPTS filed by Appellant Mr. Traesey L. Horton in 18-60508 [ # 8882400-2 ] Record Excerpts have been deemed insufficient. Corrections required: Copies of mandatory documents not attached. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. Sufficient Record Excerpts deadline updated to 10/26/2018 for Appellant Traesey L. Horton [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 10/12/2018 10:46 AM]
October 1, 2018 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Record Excerpts received from Appellant Mr. Traesey L. Horton because Record Excerpts were previously filed on September 25, 2018. [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 10/01/2018 02:15 PM]
September 27, 2018 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Record Excerpts received from Appellant Mr. Traesey L. Horton because Record Excerpts were previously filed on September 25, 2018. [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 10/01/2018 07:32 AM]
September 25, 2018 RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Mr. Traesey L. Horton. Record Excerpts NOT Sufficient as they require party name and address must be included on cover; table of contents must be separate from cover page and include proper record citations for all contents; mandatory contents are missing from table of contents and hard copies of all documents listed in record excerpts must be attached. # of Copies Provided: 1. Record Excerpts deadline satisfied. Sufficient Record Excerpts due on 10/09/2018 for Appellant Traesey L. Horton [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 09/25/2018 12:48 PM]
September 20, 2018 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Mr. Traesey L. Horton. # of Copies Provided: 7 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Record Excerpts due on 10/04/2018 for Appellant Traesey L. Horton. Appellee's Brief due on 10/22/2018 for Appellee Austrilis Oil and Gas. Paper Copies of Brief due on 09/25/2018 for Appellant Traesey L. Horton. [18-60508] (MAS) [Entered: 09/20/2018 04:28 PM]
September 20, 2018 LETTER filed by Appellant Mr. Traesey L. Horton referencing No Action Document filed by Appellant Mr. Traesey L. Horton in 18-60508 [ # 8870070-2 ]. permission to file premature brief. [18-60508] (MAS) [Entered: 09/20/2018 04:18 PM]
September 11, 2018 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/22/2018 for Appellant Traesey L. Horton. [18-60508] (DDL) [Entered: 09/11/2018 11:30 AM]
September 11, 2018 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the certificate of parties of interests service received from Appellant Mr. Traesey L. Horton because filing is premature. [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 09/11/2018 03:33 PM]
September 11, 2018 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [18-60508] (DDL) [Entered: 09/11/2018 11:24 AM]
September 10, 2018 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the brief of appellant received from Appellant Mr. Traesey L. Horton because filing is premature. [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 09/10/2018 10:39 AM]
August 28, 2018 UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 08/28/2018 10:45 AM]
August 28, 2018 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:18-CV-14. Electronic ROA due on 09/12/2018. [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 08/28/2018 11:03 AM]
August 28, 2018 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 08/24/2018 denying motions for reconsideration [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 08/28/2018 10:44 AM]
August 8, 2018 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Memorandum in Support of Notice of Appeal received from Appellant Ms. Traesey L. Horton because there is no 5th Circuit Rule regarding memoranda in support of notice of appeal. [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 08/10/2018 12:40 PM]
July 30, 2018 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the letter received from Appellee Austrilis Oil and Gas because as attorney is an active ECF filer, document must be electronically filed [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 07/30/2018 03:54 PM]
July 27, 2018 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the letter received from Appellee Austrilis Oil and Gas because as attorney is an active ECF filer, document must be electronically filed. [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 07/27/2018 02:49 PM]
July 24, 2018 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis received from Appellant Ms. Traesey L. Horton because document is unnecessary as appellant is currently proceeding in forma pauperis. [18-60508] (RLL) [Entered: 07/24/2018 11:16 AM]
July 23, 2018 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process after monitoring for ruling on Motions for Reconsideration pending in District Court (District Court documents numbered 41 & 42). [8831461-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [18-60508] (DLJ) [Entered: 07/23/2018 10:10 AM]
July 18, 2018 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Traesey L. Horton. [18-60508] (DLJ) [Entered: 07/18/2018 10:17 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Traesey Horton v. Austrilis Oil and Gas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: AUSTRILIS OIL AND GAS
Represented By: Eric Lee Patterson Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: TRAESEY L. HORTON, also known as Tracy L. Horton
Represented By: Traesey L. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?