William Burch v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: WILLIAM PAUL BURCH
Defendant / Appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Case Number: 19-11175
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
September 17, 2020 William Burch v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-11175] (CAS) [Entered: 12/02/2019 10:27 AM]
November 18, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the motion to proceed IFP received from Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch because must file for IFP in district court first [19-11175] (SDH) [Entered: 11/22/2019 04:13 PM]
November 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Rebecca Kendall Yow for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 19-11175 [19-11175] (MVM) [Entered: 11/06/2019 02:04 PM]
November 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11175] (Rebecca Kendall Yow ) [Entered: 11/05/2019 11:56 AM]
November 1, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9181468-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 11/18/2019 for Appellant William Paul Burch [19-11175] (MVM) [Entered: 11/01/2019 03:25 PM]
October 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William Lance Lewis for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 19-11175 [19-11175] (MVM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:32 AM]
October 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Marcie Lynn Schout for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 19-11175 [19-11175] (MVM) [Entered: 10/31/2019 11:31 AM]
October 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William Lance Lewis, Esq. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-11175] (William Lance Lewis ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:57 PM]
October 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-11175] (Marcie Lynn Schout ) [Entered: 10/30/2019 04:48 PM]
October 29, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9177699-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch. [9177699-1] [19-11175] (LEF) [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:43 AM]
October 29, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch [19-11175] (LEF) [Entered: 10/29/2019 08:26 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Burch v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: WILLIAM PAUL BURCH
Represented By: William Paul Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis Esq.
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Represented By: Marcie Lynn Schout Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?