Vantage Deepwater Company, et al v. Petrobras America, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellant: PETROBAS AMERICA, INCORPORATED, PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.-PETROBRAS, PETROBRAS VENEZUELA INVESTMENTS & SERVICES B.V. and PETROBRAS AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Plaintiff / Appellee: VANTAGE DEEPWATER COMPANY and VANTAGE DEEPWATER DRILLING, INCORPORATED
Case Number: 19-20435
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 16, 2020 Summary Vantage Deepwater Co. v. Petrobras America, Inc.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Tai-Heng Cheng for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (CAS) [Entered: 08/05/2019 05:48 PM]
August 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Tai-Heng Cheng ) [Entered: 08/05/2019 10:36 AM]
July 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Eric Dean McArthur for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/26/2019 04:12 PM]
July 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Peter D. Keisler for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (CB) [Entered: 07/26/2019 02:09 PM]
July 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Eric Dean McArthur ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:05 PM]
July 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Peter D. Keisler ) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:03 PM]
July 23, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Petrobras America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras. Extension Granted to and including 09/25/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 09/25/2019 for Appellants Petrobras America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras [19-20435] (ABT) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:43 PM]
July 23, 2019 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellants Petrobras America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras for filing Appellants' Opening Brief until 09/25/2019 [19-20435] (Ari MacKinnon ) [Entered: 07/23/2019 03:05 PM]
July 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kathleen Kaufmann Shih for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/19/2019 11:29 AM]
July 18, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Kathleen Kaufmann Shih ) [Entered: 07/18/2019 11:37 AM]
July 17, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/26/2019 for Appellants Petrobras America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras. [19-20435] (CMB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:51 AM]
July 17, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20435] (CMB) [Entered: 07/17/2019 09:45 AM]
July 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andrew Brad Derman for party(s) Appellant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras Appellant Petrobras America, Incorporated Appellant Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V., in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/16/2019 01:21 PM]
July 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Andrew Brad Derman ) [Entered: 07/16/2019 10:43 AM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Richard Barrett Phillips Jr. for party(s) Appellant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras Appellant Petrobras America, Incorporated Appellant Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V., in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (CBW) [Entered: 07/12/2019 03:37 PM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ariel Mestel Fox for party(s) Appellant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras Appellant Petrobras America, Incorporated Appellant Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V., in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 01:49 PM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Emily J. Balter for party(s) Appellant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras Appellant Petrobras America, Incorporated Appellant Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V., in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 01:47 PM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Boaz S. Morag for Appellant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras in 19-20435, Attorney Boaz S. Morag for Appellant Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. in 19-20435, Attorney Boaz S. Morag for Appellant Petrobras America, Incorporated in 19-20435 [19-20435] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 01:46 PM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Ari MacKinnon for party(s) Appellant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras Appellant Petrobras America, Incorporated Appellant Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V., in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 01:45 PM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Dina McKenney for party(s) Appellant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras Appellant Petrobras America, Incorporated Appellant Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V., in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 01:43 PM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William Mayer Katz Jr. for Appellant Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras in 19-20435, Attorney William Mayer Katz Jr. for Appellant Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. in 19-20435, Attorney William Mayer Katz Jr. for Appellant Petrobras America, Incorporated in 19-20435 [19-20435] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 01:41 PM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:45 AM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Ariel Mestel Fox ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:24 AM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Emily J. Balter ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:22 AM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Boaz S. Morag for Petrobras America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Boaz S. Morag ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:20 AM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Ari MacKinnon ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 11:18 AM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Paul Joseph Dobrowski for Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated in 19-20435, Attorney Paul Joseph Dobrowski for Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company in 19-20435 [19-20435] (WMJ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 10:57 AM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Dina McKenney ) [Entered: 07/12/2019 10:51 AM]
July 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William Mayer Katz, Jr. for Petrobras America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20435] (William Mayer Katz Jr.) [Entered: 07/12/2019 10:37 AM]
July 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Paul Joseph Dobrowski for Vantage Deepwater Company and Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Paul Joseph Dobrowski ) [Entered: 07/11/2019 04:17 PM]
July 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Jane Nenninger Bland for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/11/2019 02:51 PM]
July 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Jane Nenninger Bland ) [Entered: 07/11/2019 01:49 PM]
July 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kathleen Marie Sullivan for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:31 AM]
July 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Carl Richard Hennies for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:28 AM]
July 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher Darnell Porter for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:26 AM]
July 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Karl S. Stern for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:24 AM]
July 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William Balden Adams for party(s) Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated, in case 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:21 AM]
July 11, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Charles Robert Eskridge III for Appellee Vantage Deepwater Drilling, Incorporated in 19-20435, Attorney Charles Robert Eskridge III for Appellee Vantage Deepwater Company in 19-20435 [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/11/2019 08:19 AM]
July 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20435] (Kathleen Marie Sullivan ) [Entered: 07/09/2019 03:20 PM]
July 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Carl Richard Hennies ) [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:27 PM]
July 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Christopher Darnell Porter ) [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:25 PM]
July 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Charles Robert Eskridge III) [Entered: 07/09/2019 12:45 PM]
July 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (Karl S. Stern ) [Entered: 07/09/2019 12:27 PM]
July 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20435] (William Balden Adams ) [Entered: 07/09/2019 12:15 PM]
July 8, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Appellant Petrobas America, Incorporated in 19-20435, substituted by Appellant Petrobras America, Incorporated in 19-20435. [19-20435] (DLJ) [Entered: 07/08/2019 03:43 PM]
July 3, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-2246. Electronic ROA due on 07/18/2019. [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:28 AM]
July 3, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Petrobas America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:27 AM]
July 3, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Petrobas America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobrasfor the Court to process. Date of service: 07/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dobrowski, Eskridge, Fernandes; Attorney for Appellants: Katz, Morag. [19-20435] (William Mayer Katz Jr.) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:18 AM]
July 3, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Petrobas America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobrasfor the Court to process. Date of service: 07/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dobrowski, Eskridge, Fernandes; Attorney for Appellants: Katz, Morag. [19-20435] (William Mayer Katz Jr.) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:17 AM]
July 3, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Petrobas America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobrasfor the Court to process. Date of service: 07/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dobrowski, Eskridge, Fernandes; Attorney for Appellants: Katz, Morag. [19-20435] (William Mayer Katz Jr.) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:16 AM]
July 3, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellants Petrobas America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras 11/28/18 Scheduling Conference before Judge Bennett for the Court to process. Date of service: 07/03/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Dobrowski, Eskridge, Fernandes; Attorney for Appellants: Katz, Morag. [19-20435] (William Mayer Katz Jr.) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:12 AM]
June 28, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9087017-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 07/15/2019 for Appellants Petrobas America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras [19-20435] (JMW) [Entered: 06/28/2019 03:29 PM]
June 21, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Petrobas America, Incorporated, Petrobras Venezuela Investments & Services B.V. and Petroleo Brasileiro S.A.-Petrobras. [19-20435] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/21/2019 03:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Vantage Deepwater Company, et al v. Petrobras America, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PETROBAS AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: William Mayer Katz Jr.
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PETROLEO BRASILEIRO S.A.-PETROBRAS
Represented By: William Mayer Katz Jr.
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Represented By: Ari MacKinnon
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Ariel Mestel Fox
Represented By: Andrew Brad Derman Esq.
Represented By: Emily J. Balter
Represented By: Dina McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PETROBRAS VENEZUELA INVESTMENTS & SERVICES B.V.
Represented By: William Mayer Katz Jr.
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Represented By: Ari MacKinnon
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Ariel Mestel Fox
Represented By: Andrew Brad Derman Esq.
Represented By: Emily J. Balter
Represented By: Dina McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: PETROBRAS AMERICA, INCORPORATED
Represented By: William Mayer Katz Jr.
Represented By: Boaz S. Morag
Represented By: Ari MacKinnon
Represented By: Richard Barrett Phillips Jr.
Represented By: Ariel Mestel Fox
Represented By: Andrew Brad Derman Esq.
Represented By: Emily J. Balter
Represented By: Dina McKenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VANTAGE DEEPWATER COMPANY
Represented By: Edward F. Fernandes
Represented By: Charles Robert Eskridge Esq. III
Represented By: Paul Joseph Dobrowski
Represented By: Christopher Darnell Porter
Represented By: Peter D. Keisler Esq.
Represented By: Karl S. Stern
Represented By: Jane Nenninger Bland
Represented By: Eric Dean McArthur Esq.
Represented By: Carl Richard Hennies
Represented By: Tai-Heng Cheng
Represented By: Kathleen Kaufmann Shih
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Sullivan
Represented By: William Balden Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: VANTAGE DEEPWATER DRILLING, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Edward F. Fernandes
Represented By: Charles Robert Eskridge Esq. III
Represented By: Paul Joseph Dobrowski
Represented By: Christopher Darnell Porter
Represented By: Peter D. Keisler Esq.
Represented By: Karl S. Stern
Represented By: Jane Nenninger Bland
Represented By: Eric Dean McArthur Esq.
Represented By: Carl Richard Hennies
Represented By: Tai-Heng Cheng
Represented By: Kathleen Kaufmann Shih
Represented By: Kathleen Marie Sullivan
Represented By: William Balden Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?