Irena Wojcik v. Memorial Hermann Health System
Defendant / Appellee: MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM
Plaintiff / Appellant: IRENA WOJCIK
Case Number: 19-20708
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Ms. Irena Wojcik. Extension Granted to and including 01/03/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 01/03/2020 for Appellant Irena Wojcik [19-20708] (CAG) [Entered: 11/22/2019 01:06 PM]
November 22, 2019 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Ms. Irena Wojcik for filing Appellant's Brief until 01/03/2020 [19-20708] (Joshua Armstrong Verde ) [Entered: 11/22/2019 11:50 AM]
October 25, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/04/2019 for Appellant Irena Wojcik. [19-20708] (DDL) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:09 PM]
October 25, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-20708] (DDL) [Entered: 10/25/2019 01:09 PM]
October 24, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:17-CV-3198. Electronic ROA due on 11/08/2019. [19-20708] (ABT) [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:57 PM]
October 24, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Irena Wojcik advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-20708] (ABT) [Entered: 10/24/2019 12:57 PM]
October 23, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Ms. Irena Wojcikfor the Court to process. Date of service: 10/23/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Edwards, MacDowall; Attorney for Appellant: Verde. [19-20708] (Joshua Armstrong Verde ) [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:34 PM]
October 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joshua Armstrong Verde for Appellant Irena Wojcik in 19-20708 [19-20708] (DMS) [Entered: 10/23/2019 08:22 AM]
October 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Luke C. MacDowall for party(s) Appellee Memorial Hermann Health System, in case 19-20708 [19-20708] (DMS) [Entered: 10/23/2019 08:20 AM]
October 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20708] (Joshua Armstrong Verde ) [Entered: 10/22/2019 11:11 AM]
October 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kelley Riddle Edwards for Appellee Memorial Hermann Health System in 19-20708 [19-20708] (ABT) [Entered: 10/22/2019 07:28 AM]
October 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-20708] (Luke C. MacDowall ) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:55 PM]
October 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Kelley Riddle Edwards for Memorial Hermann Health System for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-20708] (Kelley Riddle Edwards ) [Entered: 10/21/2019 03:49 PM]
October 16, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9168761-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 10/31/2019 for Appellant Irena Wojcik [19-20708] (CBW) [Entered: 10/16/2019 03:52 PM]
October 9, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Irena Wojcik [19-20708] (CBW) [Entered: 10/09/2019 11:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Irena Wojcik v. Memorial Hermann Health System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MEMORIAL HERMANN HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Kelley Riddle Edwards
Represented By: Luke C. MacDowall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: IRENA WOJCIK
Represented By: Joshua Armstrong Verde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?