Morris & Dickson Co., L.L.C. v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen, et al
Defendant / Appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL, UTTAM DHILLON, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Plaintiff / Appellant: MORRIS & DICKSON COMPANY, L.L.C.
Case Number: 19-30043
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Megan Barbero is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with DOJ - see letter filed this date. [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:15 PM]
March 13, 2019 LETTER filed by Appellees Mr. William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General, DEA, Mr. Uttam Dhillon, DOJ and USA withdrawal of counsel. Date of Service: 03/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Arnold, Avergun, Carvin, Gerver, Simpson; Attorney for Appellees: Barbero, Patil, Salzman; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Spruiell [19-30043] (Megan Barbero ) [Entered: 03/13/2019 03:12 PM]
February 20, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/01/2019 for Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C.. [19-30043] (DDL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 07:57 AM]
February 20, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30043] (DDL) [Entered: 02/20/2019 07:56 AM]
February 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Keith Gerver for Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. in case 19-30043 [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:34 PM]
February 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joshua Arnold for Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. in case 19-30043 [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 02/01/2019 12:32 PM]
February 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William Simpson for Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. in case 19-30043 [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:24 AM]
February 1, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jodi Avergun for Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. in case 19-30043 [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 02/01/2019 10:22 AM]
February 1, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:18-CV-1406. Electronic ROA due on 02/19/2019. [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 02/01/2019 07:38 AM]
January 31, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-30043] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 01/31/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Barbero, Patil, Salzman; Attorney for Appellants: Carvin, Spruiell [19-30043] (Michael Anthony Carvin ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 04:30 PM]
January 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30043] (Keith Gerver ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 02:00 PM]
January 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30043] (Joshua Arnold ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:58 PM]
January 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30043] (William Simpson ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:55 PM]
January 31, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30043] (Jodi Avergun ) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:53 PM]
January 31, 2019 COURT ORDER denying motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. [ # 8969345-2 ] [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 01/31/2019 01:49 PM]
January 30, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by DEA, Mr. Uttam Dhillon, DOJ, USA and Mr. Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General [8973081-1] to the Motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. [ # 8969345-2 ] Date of Service: 01/30/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Barbero, Patil, Salzman; Attorney for Appellant: Carvin; US mail - Attorney for Appellant: Spruiell. [19-30043] (Megan Barbero ) [Entered: 01/30/2019 04:38 PM]
January 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joshua Marc Salzman for Appellee Uttam Dhillon Appellee DOJ Appellee Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General Appellee USA Appellee DEA in case 19-30043 [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:38 AM]
January 30, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Megan Barbero for Appellee Uttam Dhillon Appellee DOJ Appellee Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General Appellee USA Appellee DEA in case 19-30043 [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 01/30/2019 09:35 AM]
January 28, 2019 COURT DIRECTIVE ISSUED requesting a response to the motion to expedite appeal filed by Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. in 19-30043 [ # 8969345-2 ] Response/Opposition due by noon on 01/31/2019. [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:21 PM]
January 28, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30043] (Joshua Marc Salzman ) [Entered: 01/28/2019 12:05 PM]
January 28, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30043] (Megan Barbero ) [Entered: 01/28/2019 11:51 AM]
January 25, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. to expedite the appeal [8969345-2]. Date of service: 01/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Carvin, Spruiell; Attorney for Appellee: Patil [19-30043] (Michael Anthony Carvin ) [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:13 PM]
January 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Michael Anthony Carvin for Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. in case 19-30043 [19-30043] (AGL) [Entered: 01/25/2019 10:44 AM]
January 24, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8968364-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 02/08/2019 for Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. [19-30043] (CB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 01:30 PM]
January 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30043] (Michael Anthony Carvin ) [Entered: 01/23/2019 01:05 PM]
January 18, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Morris & Dickson Company, L.L.C. [19-30043] (RLL) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:42 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Morris & Dickson Co., L.L.C. v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Megan Barbero Esq.
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UTTAM DHILLON
Represented By: Megan Barbero Esq.
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Megan Barbero Esq.
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Megan Barbero Esq.
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Represented By: Megan Barbero Esq.
Represented By: Chetan Adinath Patil
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MORRIS & DICKSON COMPANY, L.L.C.
Represented By: Franklin H. Spruiell Jr.
Represented By: Jodi Avergun
Represented By: William Simpson
Represented By: Michael Anthony Carvin
Represented By: Joshua Arnold
Represented By: Keith Gerver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?