Dewayne Joseph v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Petitioner / Appellant: DEWAYNE LAKEITH JOSEPH
Case Number: 19-30422
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising IFP is pending in DC. Once DC rule we will send notice of the next step for processing the appeal [19-30422] (MRW) [Entered: 07/23/2019 10:58 AM]
July 10, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Dewayne Lakeith Joseph. [19-30422] (CB) [Entered: 07/10/2019 09:58 AM]
June 19, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Dewayne Lakeith Joseph. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-30422] (MRW) [Entered: 06/19/2019 01:40 PM]
June 6, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9069873-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 06/21/2019 for Appellant Dewayne Lakeith Joseph [19-30422] (SMC) [Entered: 06/06/2019 03:13 PM]
May 29, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Dewayne Lakeith Joseph [19-30422] (SMC) [Entered: 05/29/2019 02:27 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Dewayne Joseph v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Represented By: Terri Russo Lacy Esq.
Represented By: Wallace Claire Howington
Represented By: Walter James Senette Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DEWAYNE LAKEITH JOSEPH
Represented By: Dewayne Lakeith Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?