Ulysses Hill v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Petitioner / Appellant: ULYSSES HILL
Case Number: 19-30432
Filed: May 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
April 30, 2020 Ulysses Hill v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Attorney Donna Rau Andrieu added as counsel of record for Appellee Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary in 19-30432 [19-30432] (CB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:01 AM]
July 25, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Christopher James Ponoroff is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with the DA's Office. [19-30432] (CB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:02 AM]
July 11, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30432] (DDL) [Entered: 07/11/2019 01:34 PM]
July 9, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 07/09/2019 granting IFP for Appellant Mr. Ulysses Hill. [19-30432] (CB) [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:28 PM]
July 9, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:18-CV-249. Electronic ROA due on 07/24/2019. [19-30432] (CB) [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:29 PM]
July 9, 2019 LETTER ISSUED. Brief in support of a COA is required. Brief in Support due on 08/19/2019 for Appellant Ulysses Hill [19-30432] (CB) [Entered: 07/09/2019 01:30 PM]
June 26, 2019 FORWARDING MOTION for IFP received from Appellant Mr. Ulysses Hill to the District Court for filing.Fee deadline canceled. [19-30432] (MRW) [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:10 PM]
June 6, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9070028-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 06/21/2019 for Appellant Ulysses Hill [19-30432] (LEF) [Entered: 06/06/2019 04:27 PM]
June 6, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Ulysses Hill for certificate of appealability [9070460-2]. [19-30432] (MRW) [Entered: 06/07/2019 10:03 AM]
May 31, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Ulysses Hill [19-30432] (AGL) [Entered: 05/31/2019 07:27 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Ulysses Hill v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Represented By: Christopher James Ponoroff
Represented By: Donna Rau Andrieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ULYSSES HILL
Represented By: Ulysses Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?