Glen Seals v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Petitioner / Appellant: GLEN SEALS
Case Number: 19-30447
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
June 15, 2021 Summary Seals v. Vannoy

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 09/11/2019 for Appellant Glen Seals. Brief in Support due on 09/11/2019 for Appellant Glen Seals. Fee deadline updated to 09/11/2019 for Appellant Glen Seals [19-30447] (CBW) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:25 AM]
August 2, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30447] (CBW) [Entered: 08/02/2019 10:10 AM]
July 30, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:16-CV-9892. Electronic ROA due on 08/14/2019. [19-30447] (DLJ) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:47 PM]
July 30, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 07/29/2019, denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Glen Seals. [19-30447] (DLJ) [Entered: 07/30/2019 01:46 PM]
July 26, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Glen Seals. [19-30447] (CB) [Entered: 07/26/2019 08:57 AM]
June 27, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Andrea F. Long for Appellee Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary in 19-30447. [19-30447] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/27/2019 10:37 AM]
June 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30447] (Andrea F. Long ) [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:40 PM]
June 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel for Appellant Glen Seals in 19-30447 [19-30447] (CAV) [Entered: 06/25/2019 01:45 PM]
June 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel for Mr. Glen Seals for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30447] (Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel ) [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:14 PM]
June 24, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion to Appeal In Forma Pauperis and for Appointment of Counsel received 06/24/2019, from Appellant Mr. Glen Seals, because the motion is premature in light of fact a motion to appeal in forma pauperis is currently pending in District Court awaiting a ruling. [19-30447] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/24/2019 02:42 PM]
June 24, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Glen Seals. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-30447] (DLJ) [Entered: 06/24/2019 03:21 PM]
June 10, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9071852-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 06/25/2019 for Appellant Glen Seals [19-30447] (LEF) [Entered: 06/10/2019 11:45 AM]
June 4, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Glen Seals [19-30447] (LEF) [Entered: 06/04/2019 02:47 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Glen Seals v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Represented By: Andrea F. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: GLEN SEALS
Represented By: Cecelia Trenticosta Kappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?