Troy LeBouef v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Petitioner / Appellant: TROY ANTHONY LEBOUEF
Case Number: 19-30451
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 STATE COURT PAPERS FILED. Exhibits, 1 box SCP (3 vols). [19-30451] (RLL) [Entered: 07/23/2019 08:29 AM]
June 28, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef for certificate of appealability [9086895-2]. Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-30451] (MRW) [Entered: 06/28/2019 02:36 PM]
June 28, 2019 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9086895-2 ] Brief in Support deadline satisfied. [9086900-1] [19-30451] (MRW) [Entered: 06/28/2019 02:37 PM]
June 28, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:18-CV-9495. Electronic ROA due on 07/15/2019. [19-30451] (MRW) [Entered: 06/28/2019 02:40 PM]
June 26, 2019 AFFIDAVIT OF FINANCIAL STATUS filed by Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef in support of the Motion to proceed IFP filed by Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef in 19-30451 [ # 9078485-2 ]. [19-30451] (MRW) [Entered: 06/26/2019 02:37 PM]
June 26, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30451] (DDL) [Entered: 06/26/2019 03:10 PM]
June 25, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9083342-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30451] (CB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 09:59 AM]
June 25, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:18-CV-9495. Electronic ROA due on 07/10/2019. [19-30451] (CB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 10:02 AM]
June 21, 2019 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef in support of Motion to proceed IFP [ # 9078485-2 ]. [9081525-1] [19-30451] (MRW) [Entered: 06/21/2019 01:11 PM]
June 18, 2019 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed on 06/18/2019 TREATED AS A MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef to proceed in forma pauperis. [9078485-2] Fee deadline canceled. Date of service: 06/17/2019. [19-30451] (SEP) [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:11 PM]
June 18, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9078477-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef. [9078477-1] [19-30451] (SEP) [Entered: 06/18/2019 02:06 PM]
June 14, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 06/13/2019 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef. [19-30451] (LEF) [Entered: 06/14/2019 04:28 PM]
June 14, 2019 LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Fee deadline updated to 07/24/2019 for Appellant Troy Anthony LeBouef. Motion due on 07/24/2019 for Appellant Troy Anthony LeBouef. Brief in Support due on 07/24/2019 for Appellant Troy Anthony LeBouef [19-30451] (LEF) [Entered: 06/14/2019 04:29 PM]
June 10, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef. [19-30451] (LLL) [Entered: 06/10/2019 02:58 PM]
June 10, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9072249-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [19-30451]. IFP pending. (LLL) [Entered: 06/10/2019 03:02 PM]
June 5, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Troy Anthony LeBouef [19-30451] (LLL) [Entered: 06/05/2019 08:49 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Troy LeBouef v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Represented By: Ellen Daigle Doskey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TROY ANTHONY LEBOUEF
Represented By: Troy Anthony LeBouef
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?