Daniel Castro v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Petitioner / Appellant: DANIEL CASTRO
Case Number: 19-30462
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Attorney Donna Rau Andrieu added as counsel of record for Appellee Sandy McCain, Warden, Raymond Laborde Correctional Center in 19-30462 [19-30462] (CB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:04 AM]
July 25, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Christopher James Ponoroff is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with the DA's Office. [19-30462] (CB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:05 AM]
July 11, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Daniel Castro. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-30462] (JMW) [Entered: 07/11/2019 09:30 AM]
June 17, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9076924-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 07/02/2019 for Appellant Daniel Castro. [19-30462] (SEP) [Entered: 06/17/2019 10:43 AM]
June 7, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Daniel Castro. [19-30462] (SEP) [Entered: 06/07/2019 08:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Daniel Castro v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Represented By: Christopher James Ponoroff
Represented By: Donna Rau Andrieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: DANIEL CASTRO
Represented By: Daniel Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?