Tony Decloues v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Petitioner / Appellant: TONY DECLOUES
Case Number: 19-30501
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30501] (CCR) [Entered: 08/02/2019 02:21 PM]
July 30, 2019 LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Fee deadline updated to 09/09/2019 for Appellant Tony Decloues. Motion due on 09/09/2019 for Appellant Tony Decloues. Brief in Support due on 09/09/2019 for Appellant Tony Decloues. [19-30501] (RLL) [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:50 AM]
July 30, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 07/29/2019 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Tony Decloues. [19-30501] (RLL) [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:47 AM]
July 30, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:14-CV-1158. Electronic ROA due on 08/14/2019. [19-30501] (RLL) [Entered: 07/30/2019 09:53 AM]
July 25, 2019 Attorney Donna Rau Andrieu added as counsel of record for Appellee Darrel Vannoy, Warden, Louisiana State Penitentiary in 19-30501 [19-30501] (CB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:10 AM]
July 25, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Christopher James Ponoroff is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with the DA's Office. [19-30501] (CB) [Entered: 07/25/2019 09:11 AM]
July 12, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Tony Decloues. [19-30501] (CB) [Entered: 07/12/2019 10:32 AM]
June 26, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9085086-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. IFP pending DC. [19-30501] (RLL) [Entered: 06/26/2019 04:40 PM]
June 19, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Tony Decloues [19-30501] (RLL) [Entered: 06/19/2019 10:12 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Tony Decloues v. Darrel Vannoy, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DARREL VANNOY, WARDEN, LOUISIANA STATE PENITENTIARY
Represented By: Christopher James Ponoroff
Represented By: Donna Rau Andrieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: TONY DECLOUES
Represented By: Tony Decloues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?