De'Marcus Thomas v. Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc., et al
Defendant / Appellee: D&A ENTERPRISES, INCORPORATED, doing business as Servpro of Fort Collins and WALLACE, RUSH, SCHMIDT, INCORPORATED, WRS
Plaintiff / Appellant: DE'MARCUS THOMAS, individually and on behalf of all simiarly situated
Case Number: 19-30658
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 MANDATE ISSUED. Mandate issue date satisfied. [19-30658] (DTG) [Entered: 09/30/2019 10:59 AM]
September 6, 2019 COURT ORDER granting Motion to dismiss appeal filed by Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated [ # 9125241-2 ]. Mandate issue date is 09/30/2019. [19-30658] (RLL) [Entered: 09/06/2019 12:11 PM]
August 30, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. De'Marcus Thomas [9134540-1] to the Motion filed by Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated [ # 9125241-2 ] Date of Service: 08/30/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Evans, Flynt, McGoey, McGoey, Timpa, Wallace, Wimberly; Attorney for Appellants: Lausten, Vicknair. [19-30658] (Kristin Marie Lausten ) [Entered: 08/30/2019 06:47 PM]
August 27, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Kristin Marie Lausten for party(s) Appellant De'Marcus Thomas, in case 19-30658 [19-30658] (CBW) [Entered: 08/27/2019 10:38 AM]
August 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30658] (Kristin Marie Lausten ) [Entered: 08/25/2019 10:28 AM]
August 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney A'Dair Ragan Flynt for Appellee D&A Enterprises, Incorporated in case 19-30658 [19-30658] (AGL) [Entered: 08/23/2019 07:18 AM]
August 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30658] (A'Dair Ragan Flynt ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 01:44 PM]
August 22, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9127549-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 09/06/2019 for Appellant De'Marcus Thomas [19-30658] (CCR) [Entered: 08/22/2019 11:21 AM]
August 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Thomas John McGoey II for Appellee D&A Enterprises, Incorporated in 19-30658 [19-30658] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:53 PM]
August 21, 2019 The Motion to dismiss appeal filed by Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated in 19-30658 [ # 9125241-2 ] has been made sufficient. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Rpl deadline satisfied. [19-30658] (RLL) [Entered: 08/21/2019 10:26 AM]
August 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Patrick Shaw McGoey for Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated in 19-30658 [19-30658] (LLL) [Entered: 08/20/2019 03:57 PM]
August 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Andrea V. Timpa for party(s) Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated, in case 19-30658 [19-30658] (LLL) [Entered: 08/20/2019 03:55 PM]
August 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Thomas John McGoey, II for D&A Enterprises, Incorporated for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30658] (Thomas John McGoey II) [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:24 AM]
August 20, 2019 SUFFICIENT OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated to dismiss the appeal [9125241-2]. Date of service: 08/20/2019. Response/Opposition due on 08/30/2019. [19-30658] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated to dismiss the appeal [9125241-2]. Date of service: 08/20/2019. Document is insufficient for the following reasons: certificate of compliance is required. Sufficient Mtn/Resp/Reply due on 08/30/2019 for Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated [19-30658] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated to dismiss the appeal [9125241-2]. Date of service: 08/20/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Evans, McGoey, McGoey, Wallace, Wimberly; Attorney for Appellant: Vicknair [19-30658] (Patrick Shaw McGoey ) [Entered: 08/20/2019 10:11 AM]
August 20, 2019 Attorney Patrick McGoey added as counsel of record for Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated in 19-30658 [19-30658] (AGL) [Entered: 08/20/2019 09:33 AM]
August 19, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form received from Appellee Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Incorporated because the appearance form is a duplicate [19-30658] (LLL) [Entered: 08/20/2019 04:10 PM]
August 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-30658] (Andrea V. Timpa ) [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:54 AM]
August 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-30658] (Patrick Shaw McGoey ) [Entered: 08/19/2019 11:45 AM]
August 15, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. De'Marcus Thomas [19-30658] (CCR) [Entered: 08/15/2019 10:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: De'Marcus Thomas v. Wallace, Rush, Schmidt, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: D&A ENTERPRISES, INCORPORATED, doing business as Servpro of Fort Collins
Represented By: Thomas John McGoey II
Represented By: A'Dair Ragan Flynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WALLACE, RUSH, SCHMIDT, INCORPORATED, WRS
Represented By: Joelle Flannigan Evans
Represented By: Jesse Lee Wimberly Esq. III
Represented By: Phillip K. Wallace Esq.
Represented By: Joelle F. Evans
Represented By: Patrick Shaw McGoey
Represented By: Andrea V. Timpa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DE'MARCUS THOMAS, individually and on behalf of all simiarly situated
Represented By: David Paul Vicknair Esq.
Represented By: Kristin Marie Lausten Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?