Elrick Gallow v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: S W SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Petitioner / Appellant: ELRICK J. GALLOW
Case Number: 19-30746
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 COURT ORDER To the extent petitioner seeks to appeal this court's order denying his motion for authorization to file a successive 2254 application, the denial of authorization to file a successive application is not appealable. 28 U.S.C. 2244(b)(3)(E). Accordingly, the appeal is DISMISSED for want of jurisdiction. (IN DETAIL) [9163725-2]. [19-30746] (MAS) [Entered: 10/23/2019 04:15 PM]
October 17, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 10/17/2019 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. Elrick J. Gallow. Fee due on 11/01/2019 for Appellant Elrick J. Gallow [19-30746] (MAS) [Entered: 10/17/2019 02:32 PM]
October 9, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-30746] (SEP) [Entered: 10/09/2019 10:21 AM]
September 10, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Elrick J. Gallow. [19-30746] (SEP) [Entered: 09/10/2019 07:54 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Elrick Gallow v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: S W SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: ELRICK J. GALLOW
Represented By: Elrick J. Gallow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?