Jamal Claude v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Petitioner / Appellant: JAMAL CLAUDE
Case Number: 19-30780
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 PAPER STATE COURT PAPERS REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:18-CV-5313. State Court Papers due on 11/27/2019. [19-30780] (MRW) [Entered: 11/12/2019 07:55 AM]
November 11, 2019 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Appellant Mr. Jamal Claude in support of Motion for certificate of appealability [ # 9187331-2 ] Brief in Support deadline satisfied. [9187333-1] [19-30780] (MRW) [Entered: 11/12/2019 07:53 AM]
November 11, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Jamal Claude for certificate of appealability [9187331-2]. Motion due deadline satisfied. [19-30780] (MRW) [Entered: 11/12/2019 07:52 AM]
October 21, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30780] (DDL) [Entered: 10/21/2019 01:18 PM]
October 18, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 10/18/2019, granting IFP for Appellant Mr. Jamal Claude. [19-30780] (DLJ) [Entered: 10/18/2019 01:01 PM]
October 18, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:18-CV-5313. Electronic ROA due on 11/04/2019. [19-30780] (DLJ) [Entered: 10/18/2019 01:01 PM]
October 18, 2019 LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 11/27/2019, for Appellant Jamal Claude. Brief in Support due on 11/27/2019, for Appellant Jamal Claude. [19-30780] (DLJ) [Entered: 10/18/2019 01:07 PM]
October 11, 2019 FORWARDING MOTION for IFP received from Appellant Mr. Jamal Claude to the District Court for filing.Fee deadline canceled. [19-30780] (MRW) [Entered: 10/11/2019 03:34 PM]
September 26, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9153925-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 10/11/2019 for Appellant Jamal Claude [19-30780] (AGL) [Entered: 09/26/2019 02:01 PM]
September 20, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Jamal Claude [19-30780] (AGL) [Entered: 09/20/2019 07:08 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Jamal Claude v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Represented By: Irena Zajickova Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: JAMAL CLAUDE
Represented By: Jamal Claude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?