Bryant Rogers v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: W S SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Petitioner / Appellant: BRYANT ROGERS
Case Number: 19-30866
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to pay fee [9190797-2] [19-30866] (MAS) [Entered: 11/15/2019 12:57 PM]
October 24, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9174531-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 11/08/2019 for Appellant Bryant Rogers. [19-30866] (SEP) [Entered: 10/24/2019 09:33 AM]
October 21, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Bryant Rogers. [19-30866] (SEP) [Entered: 10/21/2019 09:32 AM]
October 21, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Brief in Support of Motion for Certificate of Appealability received from Appellant Mr. Bryant Rogers because the brief in support is premature [19-30866] (MRW) [Entered: 10/22/2019 10:44 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Bryant Rogers v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: W S SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: BRYANT ROGERS
Represented By: Bryant Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?