Paul Dion, Jr. v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Respondent / Appellee: SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Petitioner / Appellant: PAUL A. DION, JR.
Case Number: 19-30897
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-30897] (DDL) [Entered: 12/26/2019 07:29 AM]
December 18, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 12/16/2019, granting IFP for Appellant Mr. Paul A. Dion, Jr. [19-30897] (DLJ) [Entered: 12/18/2019 04:10 PM]
December 18, 2019 LETTER ISSUED. Motion for COA and brief in support are required. Motion due on 01/27/2020, for Appellant Paul A. Dion, Jr. Brief in Support due on 01/27/2020, for Appellant Paul A. Dion, Jr. [19-30897] (DLJ) [Entered: 12/18/2019 04:27 PM]
December 18, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 2:18-CV-182. Electronic ROA due on 01/02/2020. [19-30897] (DLJ) [Entered: 12/18/2019 04:29 PM]
November 21, 2019 FORWARDING MOTION for IFP received from Appellant Mr. Paul A. Dion, Jr. to the District Court for filing.Fee deadline canceled. [19-30897] (MRW) [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:22 PM]
November 5, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9182739-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee or IFP motion due to be filed in District Court by 11/20/2019, for Appellant Paul A. Dion, Jr. [19-30897] (DLJ) [Entered: 11/05/2019 08:17 AM]
October 31, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Paul A. Dion, Jr. [19-30897] (DLJ) [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Paul Dion, Jr. v. Sandy McCain, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: SANDY MCCAIN, WARDEN, RAYMOND LABORDE CORRECTIONAL CENTER
Represented By: Ellen Daigle Doskey Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: PAUL A. DION, JR.
Represented By: Paul A. Dion Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?