USA v. Javier Munoz
Defendant / Appellant: JAVIER MUNOZ, also known as Victor Bonilla, also known as Jarlier Munoz-Guzman
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-31010
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 4, 2021 USA v. Munoz

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 02/05/2020 striking deficient IFP motion of Appellant Mr. Javier Munoz. Fee due on 03/09/2020 for Appellant Javier Munoz [19-31010] (AGL) [Entered: 02/06/2020 10:35 AM]
January 3, 2020 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Javier Munoz. Fee deadline satisfied [19-31010] (AGL) [Entered: 01/31/2020 03:47 PM]
January 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Camille Ann Domingue for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 19-31010 [19-31010] (AGL) [Entered: 01/03/2020 01:06 PM]
January 2, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-31010] (Camille Ann Domingue ) [Entered: 01/02/2020 05:12 PM]
December 20, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. John Thomas Mickel is designated as inactive in this case. [19-31010] (AGL) [Entered: 12/20/2019 01:09 PM]
December 16, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9211400-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 12/31/2019 for Appellant Javier Munoz [19-31010] (AGL) [Entered: 12/16/2019 03:27 PM]
December 11, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 12/10/2019 denying COA for Appellant Mr. Javier Munoz [19-31010] (AGL) [Entered: 12/11/2019 02:49 PM]
December 10, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Javier Munoz [19-31010] (AGL) [Entered: 12/10/2019 12:16 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Javier Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: JAVIER MUNOZ, also known as Victor Bonilla, also known as Jarlier Munoz-Guzman
Represented By: Javier Munoz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Mickel
Represented By: Camille Ann Domingue
Represented By: Craig R. Bordelon II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?