Calvin Amos v. Denise Jefferson, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: CALVIN AMOS
Defendant / Appellee: JERMETRAS WILLIS, Nurse, C. STORY, Nurse, BOB PAGE, Warden, S. WALKER, Captain, DENISE JEFFERSON, Corporal and MICHELLE ARNOLD
Case Number: 19-40286
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Calvin Amos. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-40286] (MRW) [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:31 PM]
May 20, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion for Extension of Time received from Appellant Mr. Calvin Amos the motion is unnecessary. The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is pending in district court. Once the district court rule, we will send you notice of the next step for processing the appeal [19-40286] (MRW) [Entered: 05/21/2019 03:34 PM]
April 8, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9024558-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 06/03/2019 for Appellant Calvin Amos [19-40286] (CSG) [Entered: 04/08/2019 03:41 PM]
April 1, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Calvin Amos [19-40286] (CSG) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:13 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Calvin Amos v. Denise Jefferson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: CALVIN AMOS
Represented By: Calvin Amos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JERMETRAS WILLIS, Nurse
Represented By: Troy Alan Hornsby Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: C. STORY, Nurse
Represented By: Troy Alan Hornsby Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BOB PAGE, Warden
Represented By: Troy Alan Hornsby Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: S. WALKER, Captain
Represented By: Troy Alan Hornsby Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENISE JEFFERSON, Corporal
Represented By: Troy Alan Hornsby Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHELLE ARNOLD
Represented By: Troy Alan Hornsby Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?