Ernest Frazier v. J. Wicks, et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNKNOWN NAPIN, Hearing Officer, Joe F. Gurney Transfer Facility, J. WICKS, Assistant Warden, Joe F. Gurney Transfer Facility, W. JOCK, Counsel Sub/Disciplinary II, Joe F. Gurney Transfer Facility and T. STEPHENS, Corrections Officer, Joe F. Gurney Transfer Facility
Plaintiff / Appellant: ERNEST DEMARC FRAZIER, JR.
Case Number: 19-40342
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting motion to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 filed by Appellant Mr. Ernest Demarc Frazier, Jr. [ # 9074842-2 ] [19-40342] (DLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 08:54 AM]
June 11, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Ernest Demarc Frazier, Jr. to dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42 [9074842-2]. Date of service: 06/06/2019 [19-40342] (DLM) [Entered: 06/13/2019 08:53 AM]
May 1, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9041525-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 06/25/2019 for Appellant Ernest Demarc Frazier Jr. [19-40342] (LLL) [Entered: 05/01/2019 08:17 AM]
April 15, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Ernest Demarc Frazier [19-40342] (LLL) [Entered: 04/15/2019 03:35 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ernest Frazier v. J. Wicks, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNKNOWN NAPIN, Hearing Officer, Joe F. Gurney Transfer Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: J. WICKS, Assistant Warden, Joe F. Gurney Transfer Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: W. JOCK, Counsel Sub/Disciplinary II, Joe F. Gurney Transfer Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: T. STEPHENS, Corrections Officer, Joe F. Gurney Transfer Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ERNEST DEMARC FRAZIER, JR.
Represented By: Ernest Demarc Frazier Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?