Brad Jones v. Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C., et al
Defendant / Appellee: SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, L.L.C., also known as NewRez, L.L.C., BAYVIEW, SHELLPOINT, AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ARE SUCCESSORS OF BANK OF AMERICA N.A. FORMERLY KNOWN AS COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS ("BANA"), BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FORMERLY KNOWN AS THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE (CWALT 2006-OA17), BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C. and BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FORMERLY KNOWN AS THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE (CWALT 2006-OA17), and as Trustee For The Certificateholders OF CWMBS, Inc., CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2004-15, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2004-15, and a
Plaintiff / Appellant: BRAD JONES
Case Number: 19-40513
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Brad Jones. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Linda Griffin, Proceeding Type and Date: Hearing 06/03/2019. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 07/26/2019 for Linda Griffin, Court Reporter. [19-40513] (CAS) [Entered: 07/25/2019 02:12 PM]
July 25, 2019 FEE PAID by Appellant Mr. Brad Jones. [19-40513] (CAS) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:58 PM]
July 25, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to reopen case filed by Appellant Mr. Brad Jones [ # 9104391-2 ] [19-40513] (CAS) [Entered: 07/25/2019 01:54 PM]
July 22, 2019 MOTION filed by Appellant Mr. Brad Jones to reopen case [9104391-2] Default Remedied. Date of service: 07/20/2019 [19-40513] (CAS) [Entered: 07/23/2019 06:09 PM]
July 17, 2019 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to order transcript and make financial arrangements with court reporter[9099423-2]; failure to pay fee [9099423-2] [19-40513] (CAS) [Entered: 07/17/2019 10:21 AM]
July 3, 2019 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Ebonee Mathis. [19-40513] (Ebonee S. Mathis ) [Entered: 07/03/2019 11:06 AM]
June 25, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9083975-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 07/10/2019 for Appellant Brad Jones. Transcript order due on 07/10/2019 for Appellant Brad Jones [19-40513] (CB) [Entered: 06/25/2019 03:35 PM]
June 20, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Bank of New York Mellon formerly known as The Bank of New York, as Trustee (CWALT 2006-OA17) in 19-40513. Update: party text added., Involvement terminated for Appellees Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, L.L.C. and Bayview, Shellpoint, and The Bank of New York Mellon are successors of Bank of America N.A. formerly known as Countrywide Home Loans (BANA) in 19-40513. Reason: counsel advised they are not parties. [19-40513] (ABT) [Entered: 06/20/2019 07:28 AM]
June 5, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Exquisite Designs by Castlerock & Company, Incorporated and Mr. Brad Jones [19-40513] (ABT) [Entered: 06/05/2019 08:28 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Brad Jones v. Bayview Loan Servicing, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVICING, L.L.C., also known as NewRez, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BAYVIEW, SHELLPOINT, AND THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON ARE SUCCESSORS OF BANK OF AMERICA N.A. FORMERLY KNOWN AS COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS ("BANA")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FORMERLY KNOWN AS THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE (CWALT 2006-OA17)
Represented By: Philip Christopher Reeves
Represented By: H. Gray Burks Esq. IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BAYVIEW LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Represented By: Philip Christopher Reeves
Represented By: H. Gray Burks Esq. IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON FORMERLY KNOWN AS THE BANK OF NEW YORK, AS TRUSTEE (CWALT 2006-OA17), and as Trustee For The Certificateholders OF CWMBS, Inc., CHL Mortgage Pass-Through Trust 2004-15, Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2004-15, and a
Represented By: Philip Christopher Reeves
Represented By: H. Gray Burks Esq. IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: BRAD JONES
Represented By: Brad Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?