Enrique Valenzuela, Jr., et al v. Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff / Appellant: ENRIQUE VALENZUELA, JR. and MARISELA VALENZUELA
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, As Trustee for the Certificate Holders, CW ALT, Incorporated, Alternate Loan Trust 2007-22 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2007-22
Case Number: 19-40951
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
July 7, 2020 Enrique Valenzuela, Jr., et al v. Bank of New York

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel P. Troiano, Richard Dwayne Danner for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon, in case 19-40951, by Attorney Dennis M. Sanchez for Appellant Marisela Valenzuela in 19-40951, Attorney Dennis M. Sanchez for Appellant Enrique Valenzuela Jr. in 19-40951 [19-40951] (ABT) [Entered: 11/22/2019 02:37 PM]
November 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-40951] (Daniel P. Troiano ) [Entered: 11/22/2019 11:20 AM]
November 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40951] (Richard Dwayne Danner ) [Entered: 11/22/2019 11:18 AM]
November 21, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Enrique Valenzuela, Jr. and Ms. Marisela Valenzuela advising transcript unnecessary - no hearings held [19-40951] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Enrique Valenzuela, Jr. and Ms. Marisela Valenzuela advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 11/21/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: McCain; Attorney for Appellant: Sanchez; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Peterson [19-40951] (Dennis M. Sanchez ) [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:33 PM]
November 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Dennis M. Sanchez for Mr. Enrique Valenzuela, Jr. and Ms. Marisela Valenzuela for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-40951] (Dennis M. Sanchez ) [Entered: 11/21/2019 04:30 PM]
November 21, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:18-CV-36. Electronic ROA due on 12/06/2019. [19-40951] (ABT) [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:20 PM]
November 21, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9195193-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-40951] (ABT) [Entered: 11/21/2019 03:12 PM]
November 15, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Enrique Valenzuela, Jr. and Ms. Marisela Valenzuela [19-40951] (AS) [Entered: 11/15/2019 07:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Enrique Valenzuela, Jr., et al v. Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ENRIQUE VALENZUELA, JR.
Represented By: Dennis M. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MARISELA VALENZUELA
Represented By: Dennis M. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, As Trustee for the Certificate Holders, CW ALT, Incorporated, Alternate Loan Trust 2007-22 Mortgage Pass Through Certificates, Series 2007-22
Represented By: Barry A. McCain
Represented By: Cody Patrick Peterson Esq.
Represented By: Daniel P. Troiano
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?