VanDamme Jeanty v. Nebraska Furniture Mart, et al
Defendant / Appellee: NEBRASKA FURNITURE MART, a corporate entity, KELLY GOODNESS, JANE DOE JAILERS, 1 through 3, all individually, TEXAS DENTON COUNTY, a municipal entity, THE COLONY,TEXAS, a municipal entity, EDWARD LIPSETT, Store Director, Nebraska Furniture Mart, Officially, DAVID COULON, City of Colony Police Department, officially, CASEY MCGREGOR, TRACY MURPHREE, Denton County Sheriff's Office, officially, BIG BUBBA'S BAIL BONDS, a corporate entity, JASON STEVENS, MICHAEL DICKENS, DENTON COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, a government entity and THE COLONY POLICE DEPARTMENT, a government entity
Plaintiff / Appellant: VANDAMME V. JEANTY
Case Number: 19-41009
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Robert Jacob Davis for Appellee Jason Stevens in 19-41009, Attorney Robert Jacob Davis for Appellee David Coulon in 19-41009, Attorney Robert Jacob Davis for Appellee The Colony Police Department in 19-41009, Attorney Robert Jacob Davis for Appellee The Colony,Texas in 19-41009 [19-41009] (NFD) [Entered: 01/20/2020 03:05 PM]
January 16, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Robert Jacob Davis for Mr. David Coulon, Mr. Jason Stevens, The Colony Police Department and The Colony,Texas for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-41009] (Robert Jacob Davis ) [Entered: 01/16/2020 12:04 PM]
January 13, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-41009] (CAG) [Entered: 01/13/2020 11:52 AM]
December 10, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. VanDamme V. Jeanty [19-41009] (DMS) [Entered: 12/10/2019 08:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: VanDamme Jeanty v. Nebraska Furniture Mart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: NEBRASKA FURNITURE MART, a corporate entity
Represented By: Katherine Marie Hart Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KELLY GOODNESS
Represented By: Nichol L. Bunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JANE DOE JAILERS, 1 through 3, all individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS DENTON COUNTY, a municipal entity
Represented By: Claire Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE COLONY,TEXAS, a municipal entity
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EDWARD LIPSETT, Store Director, Nebraska Furniture Mart, Officially
Represented By: Katherine Marie Hart Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID COULON, City of Colony Police Department, officially
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CASEY MCGREGOR
Represented By: Katherine Marie Hart Sneed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TRACY MURPHREE, Denton County Sheriff's Office, officially
Represented By: Mary Erin Wilcox Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BIG BUBBA'S BAIL BONDS, a corporate entity
Represented By: Kenneth Wayne Good
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JASON STEVENS
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL DICKENS
Represented By: Claire Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DENTON COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEY'S OFFICE, a government entity
Represented By: Claire Yancey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THE COLONY POLICE DEPARTMENT, a government entity
Represented By: Robert Jacob Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: VANDAMME V. JEANTY
Represented By: VanDamme V. Jeanty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?