Nancy Calderon, et al v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: NANCY C. CALDERON and PHILLIP R. CALDERON
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Incorporated, Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2006-22 and SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Case Number: 19-50080
Filed: January 29, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 4, 2019 Nancy Calderon, et al v. Bank of New York Mellon,

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellants Ms. Nancy C. Calderon and Mr. Phillip R. Calderon. Extension Granted to and including 04/18/2019. Reason: No Opposition Stated. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/18/2019 for Appellants Nancy C. Calderon and Phillip R. Calderon [19-50080] (MGT) [Entered: 03/12/2019 04:57 PM]
February 27, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/08/2019 for Appellants Nancy C. Calderon and Phillip R. Calderon. [19-50080] (DDL) [Entered: 02/27/2019 12:31 PM]
February 27, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50080] (DDL) [Entered: 02/27/2019 11:30 AM]
February 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Branch Masterson Sheppard for Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. in 19-50080, Attorney Branch Masterson Sheppard for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon in 19-50080 [19-50080] (SDH) [Entered: 02/15/2019 11:46 AM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Branch Masterson Sheppard for Bank of New York Mellon and Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50080] (Branch Masterson Sheppard ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 12:01 PM]
February 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James Patrick Sutton for Appellant Phillip R. Calderon in 19-50080, Attorney James Patrick Sutton for Appellant Nancy C. Calderon in 19-50080. [19-50080] (SEP) [Entered: 02/08/2019 11:08 AM]
February 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50080] (James Patrick Sutton ) [Entered: 02/06/2019 02:54 PM]
February 6, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:17-CV-933. Electronic ROA due on 02/21/2019. [19-50080] (MRW) [Entered: 02/06/2019 02:21 PM]
February 6, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8978310-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50080] (MRW) [Entered: 02/06/2019 02:18 PM]
January 29, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Nancy C. Calderon and Mr. Phillip R. Calderon [19-50080] (RSM) [Entered: 01/29/2019 08:25 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nancy Calderon, et al v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY C. CALDERON
Represented By: James Patrick Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PHILLIP R. CALDERON
Represented By: James Patrick Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Incorporated, Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2006-22
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?