Anthony Floyd v. USA, et al
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, MAJOR ROBERT DE LOS SANTOS and INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Plaintiff / Appellant: ANTHONY FLOYD
Case Number: 19-50100
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50100] (DDL) [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:57 AM]
February 19, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/01/2019 for Appellant Anthony Floyd. [19-50100] (DDL) [Entered: 02/19/2019 10:57 AM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Joel Branman for party(s) Appellee USA Appellee IRS Appellee Robert De Los Santos, in case 19-50100 [19-50100] (PAC) [Entered: 02/14/2019 09:50 AM]
February 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50100] (Robert Joel Branman ) [Entered: 02/12/2019 12:46 PM]
February 12, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8982201-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50100] (PAC) [Entered: 02/12/2019 11:58 AM]
February 12, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 6:18-MC-302. Electronic ROA due on 02/27/2019. [19-50100] (PAC) [Entered: 02/12/2019 12:01 PM]
February 5, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Anthony Floyd [19-50100] (RAJ) [Entered: 02/05/2019 04:24 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Anthony Floyd v. USA, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Stephanie M. Page
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MAJOR ROBERT DE LOS SANTOS
Represented By: Stephanie M. Page
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE
Represented By: Stephanie M. Page
Represented By: Robert Joel Branman Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ANTHONY FLOYD
Represented By: Anthony Floyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?