Julio Santoyo v. Bexar County, Texas, et al
Defendant / Appellee: DANIEL BIBLE, United States Immigration and Enforcement, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ENRIQUE M. LUCERO, Field Office Director for the San Antonio Field Office, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, LEONARD DAVIS, United States Immigration and Enforcement, JOHN DOE 1-5, Employees of Immigration and Customs Enforcement, THOMAS D. HOMAN, Director of the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, BEXAR COUNTY, TEXAS and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Plaintiff / Appellant: JULIO TRUJILLO SANTOYO
Case Number: 19-50124
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Advising parties of the updated case caption [19-50124] (PAC) [Entered: 04/12/2019 03:21 PM]
April 12, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Appellant Mr. Julio Trujillo Santoyo. Extension Granted to and including 05/22/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/22/2019 for Appellant Julio Trujillo Santoyo [19-50124] (MFY) [Entered: 04/12/2019 11:56 AM]
April 12, 2019 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Appellant Mr. Julio Trujillo Santoyo for filing Appellant's Brief until 05/22/2019 [19-50124] (Juan Carlos Rodriguez Jr.) [Entered: 04/12/2019 09:55 AM]
April 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Lacy L. McAndrew for party(s) Appellee Thomas D. Homan Appellee Leonard Davis Appellee USA Appellee Enrique M. Lucero Appellee John Doe 1-5 Appellee Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Appellee Daniel Bible, in case 19-50124. [19-50124] (CB) [Entered: 04/04/2019 10:41 AM]
April 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50124] (Lacy L. McAndrew ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 02:05 PM]
March 11, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/22/2019 for Appellant Julio Trujillo Santoyo. [19-50124] (DDL) [Entered: 03/11/2019 01:57 PM]
March 11, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50124] (DDL) [Entered: 03/11/2019 01:56 PM]
March 4, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Gary Anderson is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with office. [19-50124] (MBC) [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:27 PM]
March 4, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) John Francis Paniszczyn for party(s) Appellee Thomas D. Homan Appellee Leonard Davis Appellee USA Appellee Enrique M. Lucero Appellee John Doe 1-5 Appellee Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security Appellee Daniel Bible, in case 19-50124 [19-50124] (MBC) [Entered: 03/04/2019 04:26 PM]
February 27, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50124] (John Francis Paniszczyn ) [Entered: 02/27/2019 09:13 AM]
February 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kristin Bloodworth for Appellee Bexar County, Texas in 19-50124 [19-50124] (PAC) [Entered: 02/25/2019 11:28 AM]
February 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Kristin Bloodworth for Bexar County, Texas for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50124] (Kristin Bloodworth ) [Entered: 02/22/2019 01:34 PM]
February 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Lance Edward Curtright for party(s) Appellant Julio Trujillo Santoyo, in case 19-50124 [19-50124] (MFY) [Entered: 02/20/2019 03:09 PM]
February 20, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50124] (Lance Edward Curtright ) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:59 PM]
February 20, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:16-CV-855 & 5:17-CV-54. Electronic ROA due on 03/07/2019. [19-50124] (PAC) [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:58 AM]
February 20, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received 2/19/19 from Appellant Mr. Julio Trujillo Santoyo advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-50124] (PAC) [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:57 AM]
February 20, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8987970-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50124] (PAC) [Entered: 02/20/2019 10:55 AM]
February 20, 2019 ATTORNEY NOT PARTICIPATING. Jacquelyn Christilles is designated as inactive in this case. Reason:no longer with office. [19-50124] (MBC) [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:54 AM]
February 19, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Julio Trujillo Santoyofor the Court to process. Date of service: 02/19/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Anderson, Bloodworth, Christilles; Attorney for Appellant: Rodriguez. [19-50124] (Juan Carlos Rodriguez Jr.) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:24 AM]
February 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Juan Carlos Rodriguez, Jr. for Mr. Julio Trujillo Santoyo for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50124] (Juan Carlos Rodriguez Jr.) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:12 AM]
February 12, 2019 CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Julio Trujillo Santoyo [19-50124] (AS) [Entered: 02/12/2019 12:21 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Julio Santoyo v. Bexar County, Texas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DANIEL BIBLE, United States Immigration and Enforcement
Represented By: Gary Layton Anderson
Represented By: John Francis Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: Gary Layton Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ENRIQUE M. LUCERO, Field Office Director for the San Antonio Field Office
Represented By: Gary Layton Anderson
Represented By: John Francis Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Gary Layton Anderson
Represented By: John Francis Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: LEONARD DAVIS, United States Immigration and Enforcement
Represented By: Gary Layton Anderson
Represented By: John Francis Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JOHN DOE 1-5, Employees of Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Gary Layton Anderson
Represented By: John Francis Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: THOMAS D. HOMAN, Director of the United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Gary Layton Anderson
Represented By: John Francis Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BEXAR COUNTY, TEXAS
Represented By: Kristin Bloodworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: John Francis Paniszczyn
Represented By: Lacy L. McAndrew Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JULIO TRUJILLO SANTOYO
Represented By: Lance Edward Curtright Esq.
Represented By: Juan Carlos Rodriguez Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?