U.S. Bank National Association v. Frances Howe Priegel
Defendant / Appellant: FRANCES LEAH HOWE PRIEGEL
Plaintiff / Appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, As legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 Sc6 Title Trust
Case Number: 19-50149
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/20/2019 for Appellant Frances Leah Howe Priegel. [19-50149] (DDL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:17 PM]
April 10, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50149] (DDL) [Entered: 04/10/2019 04:16 PM]
March 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Philip Stuart Traynor for Appellee U.S. Bank National Association in 19-50149 [19-50149] (CB) [Entered: 03/25/2019 11:08 AM]
March 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Philip Stuart Traynor for U.S. Bank National Association for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50149] (Philip Stuart Traynor ) [Entered: 03/22/2019 04:20 PM]
March 21, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-372. Electronic ROA due on 04/05/2019. [19-50149] (CMB) [Entered: 03/21/2019 07:44 AM]
March 21, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9010059-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50149] (CMB) [Entered: 03/21/2019 07:40 AM]
March 18, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion to set aside order etc. and leave of court to file a motion to set asid order received from Appellant Ms. Frances Leah Howe Priegel [19-50149] Should be included in brief at time of filing. (MBC) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:05 AM]
February 21, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Frances Leah Howe Priegel [19-50149] (MVM) [Entered: 02/21/2019 03:04 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Frances Howe Priegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: FRANCES LEAH HOWE PRIEGEL
Represented By: Frances Leah Howe Priegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, As legal Title Trustee for Truman 2016 Sc6 Title Trust
Represented By: Philip Stuart Traynor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?