Sebastian Bacilio-Sabastian, et al v. William Barr, et al
Respondent / Appellee: DANIEL BIBLE, Field Office Director for the San Antonio District Office of ICE, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, ROSE THOMPSON, Warden of the Karnes County Residential Center, RONALD D. VITIELLO, Deputy Director and Acting Director of ICE, BUDD RATLIFF, Acting Assistant Field Office Director for the San Antonio District of ICE, WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States, THE GEO GROUP, INCORPORATED and KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Petitioner / Appellant: RAUL US CASTRO, MANUEL SANTIAGO-LAINES, SEBASTIAN DOMINGO BACILIO-SABASTIAN and WILDER XITUMUL-GARCIA
Case Number: 19-50168
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 13, 2020 Summary Bacilio-Sabastian v. Barr

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Advising parties of the updated case caption [19-50168] (PAC) [Entered: 04/12/2019 03:26 PM]
April 9, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/20/2019 for Appellants Sebastian Domingo Bacilio-Sabastian, Raul Us Castro, Manuel Santiago-Laines and Wilder Xitumul-Garcia. [19-50168] (DDL) [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:10 PM]
April 9, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. State Court Papers included? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50168] (DDL) [Entered: 04/09/2019 04:10 PM]
March 19, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:18-CV-793. Electronic ROA due on 04/03/2019. [19-50168] (PAC) [Entered: 03/19/2019 01:11 PM]
March 19, 2019 FEE PAID by Appellants Mr. Sebastian Domingo Bacilio-Sabastian, Mr. Raul Us Castro, Mr. Manuel Santiago-Laines and Mr. Wilder Xitumul-Garcia. Fee deadline satisfied [19-50168] (PAC) [Entered: 03/19/2019 01:10 PM]
March 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Manoj Govindaiah for Appellant Manuel Santiago-Laines in 19-50168, Attorney Manoj Govindaiah for Appellant Wilder Xitumul-Garcia in 19-50168, Attorney Manoj Govindaiah for Appellant Raul Us Castro in 19-50168, Attorney Manoj Govindaiah for Appellant Sebastian Domingo Bacilio-Sabastian in 19-50168 [19-50168] (AGL) [Entered: 03/15/2019 09:05 AM]
March 13, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-50168] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Sebastian Domingo Bacilio-Sabastian, Mr. Raul Us Castro, Mr. Manuel Santiago-Laines and Mr. Wilder Xitumul-Garcia advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 03/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Dingivan; Attorney for Appellant: Govindaiah [19-50168] (Manoj Govindaiah ) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:07 PM]
March 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Manoj Govindaiah for Mr. Sebastian Domingo Bacilio-Sabastian, Mr. Raul Us Castro, Mr. Manuel Santiago-Laines and Mr. Wilder Xitumul-Garcia for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50168] (Manoj Govindaiah ) [Entered: 03/13/2019 01:05 PM]
March 4, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8996958-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Fee due on 03/19/2019 for Appellants Sebastian Domingo Bacilio-Sabastian, Raul Us Castro, Manuel Santiago-Laines and Wilder Xitumul-Garcia. [19-50168] (CMB) [Entered: 03/04/2019 11:52 AM]
February 27, 2019 PRISONER CASE WITH COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Sebastian Domingo Bacilio-Sabastian, Mr. Raul Us Castro, Mr. Manuel Santiago-Laines and Mr. Wilder Xitumul-Garcia [19-50168] (PAC) [Entered: 02/27/2019 03:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Sebastian Bacilio-Sabastian, et al v. William Barr, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: DANIEL BIBLE, Field Office Director for the San Antonio District Office of ICE
Represented By: James Dingivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: James Dingivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: ROSE THOMPSON, Warden of the Karnes County Residential Center
Represented By: James Dingivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: RONALD D. VITIELLO, Deputy Director and Acting Director of ICE
Represented By: James Dingivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: BUDD RATLIFF, Acting Assistant Field Office Director for the San Antonio District of ICE
Represented By: James Dingivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: WILLIAM P. BARR, Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: James Dingivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: THE GEO GROUP, INCORPORATED
Represented By: James Dingivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: KEVIN K. MCALEENAN, ACTING SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
Represented By: James Dingivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: RAUL US CASTRO
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: MANUEL SANTIAGO-LAINES
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: SEBASTIAN DOMINGO BACILIO-SABASTIAN
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: WILDER XITUMUL-GARCIA
Represented By: Manoj Govindaiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?