Elizabeth Domel v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Defendant / Appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Plaintiff / Appellant: ELIZABETH DOMEL
Case Number: 19-50753
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
February 24, 2020 Elizabeth Domel v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2019 APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Elizabeth Domel. Date of service: 10/11/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Hytken, Lewis, Schout; Attorney for Appellant: Pitts [19-50753] (Tony Pitts ) [Entered: 10/11/2019 12:13 AM]
September 23, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Appellant Ms. Elizabeth Domel [ # 9150472-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 10/11/2019 for Appellant Elizabeth Domel [19-50753] (MVM) [Entered: 09/23/2019 01:41 PM]
September 23, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellant Ms. Elizabeth Domel to extend time to file brief as appellant until 10/11/2019 [9150472-2]. Date of service: 09/23/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Hytken, Lewis, Schout; Attorney for Appellant: Pitts [19-50753] (Tony Pitts ) [Entered: 09/23/2019 11:40 AM]
August 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Tony Pitts for Appellant Elizabeth Domel in 19-50753 [19-50753] (SDH) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:05 PM]
August 22, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/01/2019 for Appellant Elizabeth Domel. [19-50753] (CB) [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:40 AM]
August 22, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50753] (CB) [Entered: 08/22/2019 09:40 AM]
August 21, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Transcript Order Form received from Appellant Ms. Elizabeth Domel because Transcript Order was not requested [19-50753] (CCR) [Entered: 08/21/2019 02:35 PM]
August 21, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Tony Pitts for Ms. Elizabeth Domel for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50753] (Tony Pitts ) [Entered: 08/21/2019 12:31 PM]
August 21, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:18-CV-801. Electronic ROA due on 09/05/2019. [19-50753] (CCR) [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:48 AM]
August 21, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9126497-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-50753] (CCR) [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:45 AM]
August 21, 2019 FEE PAID by Appellant Ms. Elizabeth Domel. [19-50753] (CCR) [Entered: 08/21/2019 11:44 AM]
August 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) William Lance Lewis for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 19-50753 [19-50753] (SDH) [Entered: 08/16/2019 03:10 PM]
August 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Marcie Lynn Schout for party(s) Appellee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., in case 19-50753 [19-50753] (SDH) [Entered: 08/16/2019 03:08 PM]
August 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-50753] (William Lance Lewis ) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:58 PM]
August 15, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50753] (Marcie Lynn Schout ) [Entered: 08/15/2019 03:55 PM]
August 14, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Elizabeth Domel [19-50753] (CCR) [Entered: 08/14/2019 10:35 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Elizabeth Domel v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Rachel Lee Hytken
Represented By: Marcie Lynn Schout Esq.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: ELIZABETH DOMEL
Represented By: Tony Pitts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?