Nancy Calderon, et al v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: NANCY C. CALDERON and PHILLIP R. CALDERON
Defendant / Appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Incorporated, Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2006-22 and SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Case Number: 19-50767
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to stay further proceedings in this court filed by Appellants Ms. Nancy C. Calderon and Mr. Phillip R. Calderon [ # 9155017-2 ] [19-50767] (pending decision in 19-50080) (MBC) [Entered: 10/08/2019 12:33 PM]
September 27, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION to stay further proceedings in this court. Reason: pending disposition of 19-50080. Date of service: 09/27/2019 Response/Opposition due on 10/07/2019. [19-50767] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Ms. Nancy C. Calderon and Mr. Phillip R. Calderon to stay further proceedings in this court. Reason: This appeal is wholly dependent on the outcome in another pending appeal on the merits between these parties.. Date of service: 09/27/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Sheppard; Attorney for Appellant: Sutton [19-50767] (James Patrick Sutton ) [Entered: 09/27/2019 02:02 PM]
September 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Branch Masterson Sheppard for Appellee Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. in 19-50767, Attorney Branch Masterson Sheppard for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon in 19-50767 [19-50767] (RAJ) [Entered: 09/26/2019 08:36 AM]
September 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Branch Masterson Sheppard for Bank of New York Mellon and Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50767] (Branch Masterson Sheppard ) [Entered: 09/24/2019 12:08 PM]
September 10, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/21/2019 for Appellants Nancy C. Calderon and Phillip R. Calderon. [19-50767] (DDL) [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:30 AM]
September 10, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-50767] (DDL) [Entered: 09/10/2019 10:29 AM]
September 4, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-50767] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Ms. Nancy C. Calderon and Mr. Phillip R. Calderon advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 09/04/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Sheppard; Attorney for Appellant: Sutton [19-50767] (James Patrick Sutton ) [Entered: 09/04/2019 10:36 AM]
August 23, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:17-CV-933. Electronic ROA due on 09/09/2019. [19-50767] (MBC) [Entered: 08/23/2019 11:27 AM]
August 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney James Patrick Sutton for Appellant Phillip R. Calderon in 19-50767, Attorney James Patrick Sutton for Appellant Nancy C. Calderon in 19-50767 [19-50767] (RAJ) [Entered: 08/23/2019 08:42 AM]
August 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. James Patrick Sutton for Ms. Nancy C. Calderon and Mr. Phillip R. Calderon for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-50767] (James Patrick Sutton ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:24 PM]
August 22, 2019 FEE PAID by Appellants Ms. Nancy C. Calderon and Mr. Phillip R. Calderon Fee Amount: $505.00 Receipt Number: A05-227480-73.Fee deadline satisfied [19-50767] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: FEE PAID by Appellants Ms. Nancy C. Calderon and Mr. Phillip R. Calderon for noa filed on 08/13/2019. Fee Amount: $505.00 Receipt Number: A05-227480-73. [19-50767] (James Patrick Sutton ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 02:13 PM]
August 22, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9127649-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 09/06/2019 for Appellants Nancy C. Calderon and Phillip R. Calderon [19-50767] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/22/2019 12:46 PM]
August 16, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Nancy C. Calderon and Mr. Phillip R. Calderon [19-50767] (WMJ) [Entered: 08/16/2019 10:10 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Nancy Calderon, et al v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: NANCY C. CALDERON
Represented By: James Patrick Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: PHILLIP R. CALDERON
Represented By: James Patrick Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Bank of New York, as Trustee for the Certificateholders of the CWABS, Incorporated, Asset-Backed Certificates Series 2006-22
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?