W. L., IV v. Scott Zirus
Defendant / Appellant: SCOTT ASH JAMES ZIRUS
Plaintiff / Appellee: W. L., IV, as Next Friend of W.L.,V, a Minor
Case Number: 19-50896
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 20, 2020 W. L., IV v. Scott Zirus

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Review after Fee Issue is Resolved (PLRA case). IFP pending in district court. [9181045-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [19-50896] (CBW) [Entered: 11/01/2019 11:01 AM]
November 1, 2019 DISTRICT COURT NOTICE - IFP pending for Appellant Mr. Scott Ash James Zirus. [19-50896] (CBW) [Entered: 11/01/2019 10:51 AM]
October 7, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9161709-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Scott Ash James Zirus. [9161709-1] [19-50896] (CBW) [Entered: 10/07/2019 01:02 PM]
September 30, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Scott Ash James Zirus [19-50896] (LLL) [Entered: 09/30/2019 01:39 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: W. L., IV v. Scott Zirus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SCOTT ASH JAMES ZIRUS
Represented By: Scott Ash James Zirus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: W. L., IV, as Next Friend of W.L.,V, a Minor
Represented By: Andrew Albert Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?