BITCO General Insurance Corp. v. Monroe Guaranty Insurance Co.
Plaintiff / Appellee: BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION, formerly known as Bituminous Casualty Corporation
Defendant / Appellant: MONROE GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A Memeber of the FCCI Insurance Group and MONROE GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A Member of the FCCI Insurance Group
Case Number: 19-51012
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 01/13/2020 for Appellant Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. [19-51012] (DDL) [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:13 PM]
December 2, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-51012] (DDL) [Entered: 12/02/2019 01:12 PM]
December 2, 2019 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company in 19-51012. Update: A misspelling of the word "Member" in the appellant's party text was corrected. [19-51012] (DLJ) [Entered: 12/02/2019 12:51 PM]
November 21, 2019 EXTENSION OF TIME GRANTED to the District Court to prepare the Electronic ROA until 11/29/2019. Electronic ROA deadline updated to 11/29/2019. [19-51012] (LEF) [Entered: 11/21/2019 09:28 AM]
November 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jo Allison Stasney for Appellant Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company in 19-51012 [19-51012] (LEF) [Entered: 11/14/2019 08:42 AM]
November 13, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [19-51012] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 11/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellee: Farmer; Attorney for Appellants: Harmon, Stasney [19-51012] (Jo Allison Stasney ) [Entered: 11/13/2019 11:37 AM]
November 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Jo Allison Stasney, Esq. for Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-51012] (Jo Allison Stasney ) [Entered: 11/13/2019 11:34 AM]
November 12, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) James Richard Harmon for party(s) Appellant Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company, in case 19-51012 [19-51012] (LEF) [Entered: 11/11/2019 11:30 AM]
November 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51012] (James Richard Harmon ) [Entered: 11/08/2019 02:30 PM]
November 7, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney William David Farmer for Appellee BITCO General Insurance Corporation in 19-51012 [19-51012] (LEF) [Entered: 11/07/2019 08:50 AM]
November 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. William David Farmer for BITCO General Insurance Corporation for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-51012] (William David Farmer ) [Entered: 11/06/2019 03:14 PM]
November 5, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 5:18-CV-325. Electronic ROA due on 11/20/2019. [19-51012] (CB) [Entered: 11/05/2019 09:57 AM]
November 5, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9182929-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-51012] (CB) [Entered: 11/05/2019 09:55 AM]
October 31, 2019 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Monroe Guaranty Insurance Company. [19-51012] (DLJ) [Entered: 10/31/2019 10:02 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: BITCO General Insurance Corp. v. Monroe Guaranty Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: BITCO GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION, formerly known as Bituminous Casualty Corporation
Represented By: William David Farmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MONROE GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A Memeber of the FCCI Insurance Group
Represented By: Jo Allison Stasney Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: MONROE GUARANTY INSURANCE COMPANY, A Member of the FCCI Insurance Group
Represented By: Jo Allison Stasney Esq.
Represented By: James Richard Harmon Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?