Luis Escobar-Barrientos v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR-BARRIENTOS, also known as Luis Arturo Gomez-Garcia
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60047
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
December 17, 2019 Luis Escobar-Barrientos v. William Barr, U. S. Att

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Updated case caption sent to parties for use on all future filings in this case. [19-60047] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:49 PM]
February 20, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/01/2019 for Petitioner Luis Fernando Escobar-Barrientos. [19-60047] (MRB) [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:36 AM]
February 19, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60047] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:52 PM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Virlenys Palma for Petitioner Luis Fernando Escobar-Barrientos in 19-60047. [19-60047] (DLJ) [Entered: 02/14/2019 09:57 AM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60047] (Virlenys H. Palma ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:33 PM]
January 23, 2019 FEE PAID by Petitioner Mr. Luis Fernando Escobar-Barrientos. Fee deadline satisfied. [19-60047] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:05 AM]
January 22, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the duplicate appearance form electronically filed by attorney Anthony John Messuri on 01/22/2019, because duplicate docket events are not allowed without leave of the Court. Further, the Court has already accepted & processed counsel's prior appearance form electronically filed 01/16/2019. [19-60047] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/22/2019 02:48 PM]
January 17, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8963150-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60047] (AGL) [Entered: 01/17/2019 08:25 AM]
January 17, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Anthony John Messuri for Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60047. [19-60047] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/17/2019 08:05 AM]
January 16, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60047] (Anthony John Messuri ) [Entered: 01/16/2019 03:04 PM]
January 16, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Luis Fernando Escobar-Barrientos. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/16/2019. Immigration File Number: a094 805 582 Fee due on 01/31/2019 for Petitioner Luis Fernando Escobar-Barrientos. Administrative Record due on 02/25/2019 [19-60047] (CB) [Entered: 01/16/2019 01:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Luis Escobar-Barrientos v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LUIS FERNANDO ESCOBAR-BARRIENTOS, also known as Luis Arturo Gomez-Garcia
Represented By: Virlenys H. Palma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Anthony John Messuri Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?