Denis Sanchez-Rojas v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: DENIS OMAR SANCHEZ-ROJAS
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60054
Filed: January 18, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to pay fee [8991229-2] [19-60054] (RLL) [Entered: 02/25/2019 09:55 AM]
February 21, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60054] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/21/2019 07:26 AM]
February 20, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: Advising parties of updated caption in light of new Attorney General. [19-60054] (SEP) [Entered: 02/20/2019 09:49 AM]
January 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Timothy George Hayes for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60054. [19-60054] (SEP) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:21 PM]
January 22, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60054] (Timothy George Hayes ) [Entered: 01/22/2019 09:44 AM]
January 22, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8965715-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60054] (CB) [Entered: 01/22/2019 09:40 AM]
January 18, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Denis Omar Sanchez-Rojas. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/17/2019. Immigration File Number: a208 983 484 Fee due on 02/04/2019 for Petitioner Denis Omar Sanchez-Rojas. Administrative Record due on 02/27/2019 [19-60054] (CB) [Entered: 01/18/2019 09:46 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Denis Sanchez-Rojas v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DENIS OMAR SANCHEZ-ROJAS
Represented By: Denis Omar Sanchez-Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Timothy George Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?