Mildred Veliz-Osuna, et al v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: O. O. P. V., A. L. P. V. and MILDRED LISETH VELIZ-OSUNA
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60058
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 CLERK ORDER granting Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief filed by Petitioners Ms. Mildred Liseth Veliz-Osuna, Mr. A. L. P. V. and Mr. O. O. P. V. [ # 9004389-2 ] A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/26/2019 for Petitioners A. L. P. V., O. O. P. V. and Mildred Liseth Veliz-Osuna [19-60058] (RLL) [Entered: 03/14/2019 08:33 AM]
March 13, 2019 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Petitioners Mr. A. L. P. V., Mr. O. O. P. V. and Ms. Mildred Liseth Veliz-Osuna to extend time to file brief as appellant until 04/26/2019 [9004389-2]. Date of service: 03/13/2019 [19-60058] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Petitioners Mr. A. L. P. V., Mr. O. O. P. V. and Ms. Mildred Liseth Veliz-Osuna to extend time to file brief as appellant until 04/26/2019 [9004389-2]. Date of service: 03/13/2019 via email - Attorney for Petitioner: Laven; Attorney for Respondents: OIL, Tyler [19-60058] (Anita Laven ) [Entered: 03/13/2019 05:53 PM]
February 21, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: providing parties with revised caption to be used in all future filings. [19-60058] (RLL) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:41 PM]
February 15, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/27/2019 for Petitioners A. L. P. V., O. O. P. V. and Mildred Liseth Veliz-Osuna. [19-60058] (DDL) [Entered: 02/15/2019 03:11 PM]
February 15, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60058] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/15/2019 01:14 PM]
January 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Julia Jennings Tyler for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60058 [19-60058] (RLL) [Entered: 01/25/2019 04:00 PM]
January 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60058] (Julia Jennings Tyler ) [Entered: 01/23/2019 12:48 PM]
January 23, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8967136-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60058] (LEF) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:51 AM]
January 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Anita Laven for Petitioner O. O. P. V. in 19-60058, Attorney Anita Laven for Petitioner A. L. P. V. in 19-60058, Attorney Anita Laven for Petitioner Mildred Liseth Veliz-Osuna in 19-60058 [19-60058] (RLL) [Entered: 01/23/2019 11:17 AM]
January 22, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioners Mr. A. L. P. V., Mr. O. O. P. V. and Ms. Mildred Liseth Veliz-Osuna. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/18/2019. Immigration File Number: A208 276 280, A208 276 281, A208 276 282 Administrative Record due on 03/04/2019 [19-60058] (LEF) [Entered: 01/22/2019 03:19 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mildred Veliz-Osuna, et al v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Julia Jennings Tyler Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: O. O. P. V.
Represented By: Anita Laven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A. L. P. V.
Represented By: Anita Laven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MILDRED LISETH VELIZ-OSUNA
Represented By: Anita Laven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?