Guillermo Reyes Garcia v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: GUILLERMO REYES GARCIA
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60060
Filed: January 23, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/03/2019 for Petitioner Guillermo Reyes Garcia. [19-60060] (DDL) [Entered: 02/22/2019 01:26 PM]
February 21, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: providing parties with revised caption to be used on all future filings [19-60060] (MAS) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:24 AM]
February 21, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60060] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/21/2019 07:20 AM]
January 24, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Robert Dale Tennyson Jr. for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60060 [19-60060] (MAS) [Entered: 01/24/2019 03:05 PM]
January 24, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8968155-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60060] (CB) [Entered: 01/24/2019 11:40 AM]
January 23, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60060] (Robert Dale Tennyson Jr.) [Entered: 01/23/2019 10:21 AM]
January 23, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Guillermo Reyes Garcia. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/22/2019. Immigration File Number: a216 567 089 Administrative Record due on 03/04/2019 [19-60060] (CB) [Entered: 01/23/2019 07:45 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Guillermo Reyes Garcia v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Robert Dale Tennyson Ph. D. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GUILLERMO REYES GARCIA
Represented By: Marvic Gonzalez Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?