David Velasquez Amaya v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: DAVID ANTONIO VELASQUEZ AMAYA
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60066
Filed: January 25, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
May 29, 2020 David Velasquez Amaya v. William Barr, U. S. Atty

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 LETTER filed by Petitioner Mr. David Antonio Velasquez Amaya [19-60066] (MAS) [Entered: 03/01/2019 09:31 AM]
February 28, 2019 LETTER REISSUED due to Address Change.A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 04/09/2019 for Petitioner David Antonio Velasquez Amaya [19-60066] (MAS) [Entered: 03/01/2019 09:17 AM]
February 21, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: providing parties with revised caption to be used on all future filings [19-60066] (MAS) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:11 AM]
February 12, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/25/2019 for Petitioner David Antonio Velasquez Amaya. [19-60066] (DDL) [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:47 PM]
February 12, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60066] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/12/2019 01:17 PM]
January 31, 2019 COURT ORDER granting Motion to proceed IFP filed by Petitioner Mr. David Antonio Velasquez Amaya [ # 8969016-2 ] [19-60066] (MAS) [Entered: 01/31/2019 12:55 PM]
January 29, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Maarja Tiganik Luhtaru for Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General in 19-60066 [19-60066] (MAS) [Entered: 01/29/2019 09:47 AM]
January 28, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8970677-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60066] (RLL) [Entered: 01/28/2019 02:54 PM]
January 28, 2019 COURT ORDER denying Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. David Antonio Velasquez Amaya [ # 8969013-2 ] [19-60066] (MAS) [Entered: 01/28/2019 10:32 AM]
January 25, 2019 NOTICE OF INTENT TO DEPORT The petitioner is currently in custody Notice of Intent Due deadline satisfied. [19-60066] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: NOTICE OF INTENT TO DEPORT filed by Respondent Mr. Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General. The petitioner is currently in custody and is not scheduled for removal before February 2, 2019. Date of Removal: 02/02/2019. Date of Service: 01/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Luhtaru, OIL; US mail - Petitioner Velasquez Amaya. [19-60066] (Maarja Tiganik Luhtaru ) [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:24 PM]
January 25, 2019 Attorney Maarja Luhtaru added as counsel of record for Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General in 19-60066. [19-60066] (DLJ) [Entered: 01/25/2019 02:05 PM]
January 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60066] (Maarja Tiganik Luhtaru ) [Entered: 01/25/2019 01:38 PM]
January 25, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. David Antonio Velasquez Amaya to proceed in forma pauperis [8969016-2]. [19-60066] (RLL) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:54 AM]
January 25, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. David Antonio Velasquez Amaya for stay of deportation [8969013-2] Notice of Intent Due on 02/01/2019 for Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General. Date of service: 01/04/2019 Response/Opposition due on 02/04/2019. [19-60066] (RLL) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:52 AM]
January 25, 2019 AGENCY TRANSFER CASE docketed. Filing order of the Ninth Circuit transferring case to this Court. Date received in 5th Circuit: 01/24/2019. Immigration File Number: A209 309 923. Administrative Record due on 03/06/2019. [19-60066] (RLL) [Entered: 01/25/2019 09:41 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: David Velasquez Amaya v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID ANTONIO VELASQUEZ AMAYA
Represented By: David Antonio Velasquez Amaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Maarja Tiganik Luhtaru
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?