Joseph Martinez Solano v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: JOSEPH MARTINEZ SOLANO
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60088
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano to reopen case [9023515-2]. Date of service: 04/05/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Alexander, OIL; Attorney for Petitioner: Ali [19-60088] (Zulu Abdullah Ali ) [Entered: 04/05/2019 05:22 PM]
April 4, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion to reopen and reinstate petition for review, with the petitioner's brief. received from Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano because the motion and the petitioner's brief is not in PDF, a PDF file is required, not scanned [19-60088] (MAS) [Entered: 04/05/2019 10:16 AM]
April 2, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the Motion for reconsideration of court's order 4/1/19 and reinstatement of the case because 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to file petitioner's brief. A motion to reopen case with a sufficient brief attached to satisfy the default is required. [19-60088] (MAS) [Entered: 04/03/2019 09:40 AM]
April 1, 2019 CLERK ORDER dismissing appeal pursuant to 5th Circuit Rule 42 for failure to file appellant's brief [9018259-2] [19-60088] (MAS) [Entered: 04/01/2019 10:42 AM]
February 26, 2019 COURT ORDER denying Motion for reconsideration filed by Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano [ # 8992206-2 ] [19-60088] (MAS) [Entered: 02/26/2019 03:41 PM]
February 25, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano for reconsideration of the Order dated 02/12/2019 [8992206-2]. Date of service: 02/25/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Alexander, OIL; Attorney for Petitioner: Ali [19-60088] (Zulu Abdullah Ali ) [Entered: 02/25/2019 09:01 PM]
February 19, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising of a revised caption [19-60088] (MAS) [Entered: 02/19/2019 04:18 PM]
February 13, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 03/25/2019 for Petitioner Joseph Martinez Solano. [19-60088] (DDL) [Entered: 02/13/2019 04:20 PM]
February 13, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60088] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 01:08 PM]
February 12, 2019 COURT ORDER denying oppoed motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano [ # 8977669-2 ] [19-60088] (CB) [Entered: 02/12/2019 09:35 PM]
February 12, 2019 MEMO IN SUPPORT of Motion for stay of deportation [ # 8977669-2 ] [19-60088] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano for stay of deportation [8982812-2]. Date of service: 02/12/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Alexander, OIL; Attorney for Petitioner: Ali [19-60088] (Zulu Abdullah Ali ) [Entered: 02/12/2019 08:54 PM]
February 11, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION [8981112-1] to the Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano in 19-60088 [ # 8977669-2 ]Response/Opposition deadline satisfied. Date of Service: 02/11/2019. [19-60088] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General [8981112-1] to the Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano [ # 8977669-2 ] Date of Service: 02/11/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: Alexander, OIL; Attorney for Petitioner: Ali. [19-60088] (Gerald Mark Alexander ) [Entered: 02/11/2019 12:17 PM]
February 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Gerald Mark Alexander for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60088 [19-60088] (MAS) [Entered: 02/08/2019 08:36 AM]
February 6, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60088] (Gerald Mark Alexander ) [Entered: 02/06/2019 12:42 PM]
February 6, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8977763-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60088] (CB) [Entered: 02/06/2019 09:21 AM]
February 6, 2019 MOTION filed by Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano for stay of deportation (INCORPORATED IN PETITION FOR REVIEW) [8977669-2]. Response/Opposition due on 02/19/2019 or sooner if the document is certified as an emergency. [19-60088] (CB) [Entered: 02/06/2019 08:29 AM]
February 6, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. Joseph Martinez Solano. Date received in 5th Circuit: 02/05/2019. Immigration File Number: a078 461 380 Administrative Record due on 03/18/2019 [19-60088] (CB) [Entered: 02/06/2019 08:20 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joseph Martinez Solano v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSEPH MARTINEZ SOLANO
Represented By: Zulu Abdullah Ali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Gerald Mark Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?