James Angulo v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: JAMES QUNITERO ANGULO and JAMES QUINTERO ANGULO
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60096
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Raed Gonzalez for Petitioner James Quintero Angulo in 19-60096 [19-60096] (MAS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 12:15 PM]
April 8, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Petitioner Mr. James Quintero Angulo. Extension Granted to and including 05/09/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/09/2019 for Petitioner James Quintero Angulo [19-60096] (MAS) [Entered: 04/08/2019 09:38 AM]
April 5, 2019 UNOPPOSED LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Petitioner Mr. James Quintero Angulo for filing Petitioner/Appellant Brief until 05/09/2019 [19-60096] (Raed Gonzalez ) [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:54 PM]
April 5, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Raed Gonzalez, Esq. for Mr. James Quintero Angulo for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60096] (Raed Gonzalez ) [Entered: 04/05/2019 04:48 PM]
February 28, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/09/2019 for Petitioner James Qunitero Angulo. [19-60096] (DDL) [Entered: 02/28/2019 03:24 PM]
February 28, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60096] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 02/28/2019 01:01 PM]
February 21, 2019 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: providing parties with revised caption to be used on all future filings [19-60096] (MAS) [Entered: 02/21/2019 10:35 AM]
February 19, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8987092-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60096] (CB) [Entered: 02/19/2019 01:39 PM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Surell Brady for party(s) Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General, in case 19-60096 [19-60096] (CB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 08:44 AM]
February 13, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60096] (Surell Brady ) [Entered: 02/13/2019 08:26 AM]
February 12, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Mr. James Qunitero Angulo. Date received in 5th Circuit: 02/12/2019. Immigration File Number: a076 837 739 Administrative Record due on 03/25/2019 [19-60096] (CB) [Entered: 02/12/2019 11:06 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Angulo v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES QUNITERO ANGULO
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES QUINTERO ANGULO
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Surell Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?