Josefina Ortiz Corrales v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Petitioner: JOSEFINA MERARY ORTIZ CORRALES
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL and WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 19-60099
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
November 13, 2020 Josefina Ortiz Corrales v. William Barr, U. S. Att

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Kaitlin Elizabeth Welborn for Petitioner Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales in 19-60099 [19-60099] (MAS) [Entered: 04/03/2019 02:41 PM]
April 3, 2019 EXTENSION RECEIVED for Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales. Extension Granted to and including 05/10/2019. A/Pet's Brief deadline updated to 05/10/2019 for Petitioner Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales [19-60099] (MAS) [Entered: 04/03/2019 10:02 AM]
April 2, 2019 LEVEL 1 EXTENSION REQUESTED by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales for filing Petitioner's Brief until 05/02/2019 [19-60099] (Kaitlin Elizabeth Welborn ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 01:50 PM]
April 2, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Kaitlin Elizabeth Welborn for Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60099] (Kaitlin Elizabeth Welborn ) [Entered: 04/02/2019 11:14 AM]
March 1, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 04/10/2019 for Petitioner Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales. [19-60099] (MRB) [Entered: 03/01/2019 02:30 PM]
March 1, 2019 IMMIGRATION RECORD FILED. [19-60099] (DOJ Executive Office of Immigration Review ) [Entered: 03/01/2019 01:40 PM]
February 21, 2019 COURT ORDER denying Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales. The temporary order staying removal is hereby dissolved. (IN DETAIL) [ # 8984771-3 ] [19-60099] (MAS) [Entered: 02/21/2019 02:23 PM]
February 20, 2019 LETTER filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales referencing Memo Supporting Document filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales [ # 8984785-2 ]. Date of Service: 02/20/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: OIL, Seymour; Attorney for Petitioner: Welborn [19-60099] (Kaitlin Elizabeth Welborn ) [Entered: 02/20/2019 02:03 PM]
February 20, 2019 REPLY filed by [8988093-1] to the Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales in 19-60099 [ # 8984771-3 ], to the Response/Opposition filed by Respondent Mr. William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General in 19-60099 [ # 8986870-2 ]. Date of Service: 02/20/2019. [19-60099]REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales [8988093-1] to the Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioners Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales and Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales [ # 8984771-3 ] Date of Service: 02/20/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: OIL, Seymour; Attorney for Petitioner: Welborn. [19-60099] (Kaitlin Elizabeth Welborn ) [Entered: 02/20/2019 11:56 AM]
February 19, 2019 RESPONSE/OPPOSITION filed by Mr. William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General [8986870-1] to the Motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioners Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales and Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales [ # 8984771-3 ] Date of Service: 02/19/2019 via email - Attorney for Respondents: OIL, Seymour; Attorney for Petitioner: Welborn. [19-60099] (Nelle Montgomery Seymour ) [Entered: 02/19/2019 11:30 AM]
February 19, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Nelle Montgomery Seymour for Respondent William P. Barr, U. S. Attorney General in 19-60099 [19-60099] (AGL) [Entered: 02/18/2019 08:56 AM]
February 14, 2019 Attorney Nelle M. Seymour added as counsel of record for Respondent Matthew G. Whitaker, Acting U. S. Attorney General in 19-60099 [19-60099] (CB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:54 PM]
February 14, 2019 COURT ORDER grants the oposed motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales temporarily for 7 days. [ # 8984771-3 ]; A response to the motion for stay of deportation filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales in 19-60099 is due by noon on 02/19/2019 and a reply to the response is due by noon on 02/20/2019. [ # 8984771-3 ] Response/Opposition due on 02/19/2019; Reply due on 02/20/19. [8984789-2] [19-60099] (CB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:45 PM]
February 14, 2019 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of Motion for stay of deportation [ # 8984771-3 ] filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales [19-60099] (CB) [Entered: 02/14/2019 06:36 PM]
February 14, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60099] (Nelle Montgomery Seymour ) [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:50 PM]
February 14, 2019 OPPOSED MOTION filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales for stay of deportation [8984771-3]. [19-60099] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: OPPOSED MOTION filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales for expedited ruling on [8984771-2], for stay of deportation [8984771-3]. Date of service: 02/14/2019 via US mail - Attorney for Respondent: OIL; email - Attorney for Petitioner: Welborn [19-60099] (Kaitlin Elizabeth Welborn ) [Entered: 02/14/2019 04:48 PM]
February 14, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [8984460-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [19-60099] (LEF) [Entered: 02/14/2019 01:54 PM]
February 14, 2019 IMMIGRATION CASE docketed. Petition for review filed by Petitioner Ms. Josefina Merary Ortiz Corrales. Date received in 5th Circuit: 02/13/2019. Immigration File Number: A097 745 057 Administrative Record due on 03/26/2019 [19-60099] (LEF) [Entered: 02/14/2019 10:34 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Josefina Ortiz Corrales v. William Barr, U. S. Atty Gen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSEFINA MERARY ORTIZ CORRALES
Represented By: Kaitlin Elizabeth Welborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MATTHEW G. WHITAKER, ACTING U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: WILLIAM P. BARR, U. S. ATTORNEY GENERAL
Represented By: Nelle Montgomery Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?