USA v. Brian Galbreth
Defendant / Appellant: BRIAN GALBRETH
Plaintiff / Appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 19-60181
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/24/2019 for Appellant Brian Galbreth. [19-60181] (DMS) [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:26 AM]
May 14, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-60181] (DMS) [Entered: 05/14/2019 11:25 AM]
April 24, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:17-CR-65-1. Electronic ROA due on 05/09/2019. [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/24/2019 08:07 AM]
April 24, 2019 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Teri Barker Norton, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 04/23/2019 Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date canceled [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/24/2019 08:06 AM]
April 23, 2019 NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant Mr. Brian Galbreth is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-60181] (Teri Barker Norton ) [Entered: 04/23/2019 04:14 PM]
April 17, 2019 TRANSCRIPT FILED IN DISTRICT COURT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Sherri Penny, Dt. Filed in Dist. Ct: 04/17/2019 Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment deadline canceled [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/17/2019 02:30 PM]
April 17, 2019 NOTICE RECEIVED that the transcript ordered by Appellant Mr. Brian Galbreth is complete and has been filed in the District Court. [19-60181] (Sherri Penny ) [Entered: 04/17/2019 12:00 PM]
April 16, 2019 ACKNOWLEDGMENT Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Teri Barker Norton, Est. Completion Dt: 05/13/2019, Est. No.of Pgs: 25, Dt. Fin Arrangements Made: 04/16/2019, Dt. Trans. to be Filed: 05/13/2019, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 11/28/2018 , Sentencing 03/12/2019. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment ddl satisfied. Transcript Due/Court Reporter Discount Date is 05/13/2019 for Teri Barker Norton, Court Reporter [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/16/2019 04:38 PM]
April 16, 2019 COURT REPORTER ACKNOWLEDGMENT received from Court Reporter Ms. Teri Barker Norton. [19-60181] (Teri Barker Norton ) [Entered: 04/16/2019 01:25 PM]
April 11, 2019 2 TRANSCRIPT ORDERS received from Appellant Mr. Brian Galbreth. DETAILS: Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Teri Barker Norton, Proceeding Type and Date: Motion Hearing 11/28/2018 , Sentencing 03/12/2019 ; Transcript Order: Court Reporter: Sherri Penny, Proceeding Type and Date: Plea Hearing 12/11/2018. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. Ct. Reporter Acknowledgment due on 04/22/2019 for Teri Norton, Court Reporter and Sherri Penny. Electronic Filing Processed: [ # 9027160-2 ] [19-60181] (CB) [Entered: 04/12/2019 08:39 AM]
April 11, 2019 ATTORNEY TRANSCRIPT ORDER form filed by Appellant Mr. Brian Galbrethfor the Court to process. Date of service: 04/11/2019 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cleveland, Cole; Attorney for Appellant: Epps. [19-60181] (Julie Ann Epps ) [Entered: 04/11/2019 09:49 AM]
April 10, 2019 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the letter received from Appellant Mr. Brian Galbreth because the party has appointed counsel [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:27 PM]
April 10, 2019 UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. Signed Notice of Appeal has been received and transcript order form deadline has been created. [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:21 PM]
April 10, 2019 SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL FILED filed by Appellant Mr. Brian Galbreth. [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/10/2019 02:12 PM]
April 10, 2019 CJA APPOINTMENT for Attorney Ms. Julie Ann Epps, Esq. for Mr. Brian Galbreth. Counsel must use the eVoucher system to file the voucher at disposition of the case. Please see the attached document for further guidance. ORIGINATING COURT DISTRICT: SMS ORIGINATING CASE NUMBER: 1:17-CR-65-1 DEFENDANT NUMBER: 1 DATE OF APPOINTMENT: 04/03/2019 [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/10/2019 01:55 PM]
April 10, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Julie Ann Epps for Appellant Brian Galbreth in 19-60181 [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/10/2019 01:41 PM]
April 10, 2019 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 04/03/2019 appointing Julie Ann Epps as counsel for Appellant Brian Galbreth in 19-60181, terminating Attorney Doyle Lee Coats Sr. for Appellant Brian Galbreth in 19-60181. [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 04/10/2019 01:40 PM]
April 9, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60181] (Julie Ann Epps ) [Entered: 04/09/2019 02:02 PM]
March 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Gaines H. Cleveland for party(s) Appellee USA, in case 19-60181 [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 03/26/2019 03:55 PM]
March 26, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Shundral Hobson Cole for Appellee USA in 19-60181 [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 03/26/2019 03:54 PM]
March 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [19-60181] (Gaines H. Cleveland ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 05:08 PM]
March 25, 2019 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mrs. Shundral Hobson Cole for USA for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [19-60181] (Shundral Hobson Cole ) [Entered: 03/25/2019 05:04 PM]
March 22, 2019 CJA APPOINTMENT for Attorney Mr. Doyle Lee Coats, Sr., Esq. for Mr. Brian Galbreth. Counsel must use the eVoucher system to file the voucher at disposition of the case. Please see the attached document for further guidance. ORIGINATING COURT DISTRICT: SMS ORIGINATING CASE NUMBER: 1:17-CR-65-1 DEFENDANT NUMBER: 1 DATE OF APPOINTMENT: 03/22/2019 [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:47 AM]
March 22, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9011686-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Miscellaneous due on 04/22/2019 for Appellant Brian Galbreth (monitoring for signed NOA). [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 03/22/2019 10:34 AM]
March 21, 2019 DIRECT CRIMINAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Brian Galbreth [19-60181] (LEF) [Entered: 03/21/2019 02:00 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: USA v. Brian Galbreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: BRIAN GALBRETH
Represented By: Doyle Lee Coats Esq. Sr.
Represented By: Julie Ann Epps Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Shundral Hobson Cole
Represented By: Gaines H. Cleveland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?