Dietrich Thomas v. David Shulkin, Secretary, et al
Plaintiff / Appellant: DIETRICH THOMAS
Defendant / Appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS, ANTHONY DAWSON, Associate Director, DAVID J. SHULKIN, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS, CHRISTOPHER SALSO, Interim Director, BILOXI, MISSISSIPPI VAMC and WILLIAM HARDY, EEOC Manager, Biloxi, Mississippi VAMC
Case Number: 19-60713
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 12/16/2019 for Appellant Dietrich Thomas. [19-60713] (CB) [Entered: 11/05/2019 10:41 AM]
November 5, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [19-60713] (CB) [Entered: 11/05/2019 10:41 AM]
October 23, 2019 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 1:17-CV-282. Electronic ROA due on 11/07/2019. [19-60713] (AGL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:40 AM]
October 22, 2019 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Dietrich Thomas advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [19-60713] (AGL) [Entered: 10/23/2019 09:39 AM]
September 30, 2019 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9155923-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 10/15/2019 for Appellant Dietrich Thomas [19-60713] (AGL) [Entered: 09/30/2019 12:41 PM]
September 24, 2019 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Dietrich Thomas [19-60713] (AGL) [Entered: 09/24/2019 09:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dietrich Thomas v. David Shulkin, Secretary, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DIETRICH THOMAS
Represented By: Dietrich Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF VETERANS AFFAIRS
Represented By: Kristi Haskins Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ANTHONY DAWSON, Associate Director
Represented By: Kristi Haskins Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DAVID J. SHULKIN, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS
Represented By: Kristi Haskins Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER SALSO, Interim Director
Represented By: Kristi Haskins Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BILOXI, MISSISSIPPI VAMC
Represented By: Kristi Haskins Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: WILLIAM HARDY, EEOC Manager, Biloxi, Mississippi VAMC
Represented By: Kristi Haskins Johnson Esq.
Represented By: Angela Givens Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?