Kim Block v. Interoil Corporation, et al
Defendant / Appellee: MICHAEL HESSION, EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION, CHEE KEONG YAP, SIR WILSON KAMIT, INTEROIL CORPORATION, ISIKELI REUBEN TAUREKA, CHRISTOPHER FINLAYSON, FORD GRANT NICHOLSON, DR. ELLIS ARMSTRONG and SIR RABBIE L. NAMALIU
Plaintiff / Appellant: MELANIE A. CISSONE, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated and KIM C. BLOCK, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Case Number: 20-10288
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 06/15/2020 for Appellant Melanie A. Cissone. [20-10288] (DDL) [Entered: 05/06/2020 09:35 AM]
May 6, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-10288] (DDL) [Entered: 05/06/2020 09:34 AM]
April 16, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-7. Electronic ROA due on 05/01/2020. [20-10288] (MBC) [Entered: 04/16/2020 12:35 PM]
April 14, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Joe Kendall for Appellant Melanie A. Cissone in 20-10288 [20-10288] (RSM) [Entered: 04/14/2020 03:02 PM]
April 14, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10288] (Elton Joe Kendall ) [Entered: 04/14/2020 12:51 PM]
April 14, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [20-10288] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Ms. Melanie A. Cissone advising transcript unnecessary as it is already filed. Date of Service: 04/14/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Cortell, Gold; Attorney for Appellants: Daley, Kendall, Wissbroecker [20-10288] (David T. Wissbroecker ) [Entered: 04/14/2020 12:12 PM]
April 7, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Party information modified for Melanie A. Cissone in 20-10288. [20-10288] (RSM) [Entered: 04/07/2020 09:15 AM]
April 6, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David T. Wissbroecker for party(s) Appellant Melanie A. Cissone, in case 20-10288 [20-10288] (RSM) [Entered: 04/06/2020 07:11 AM]
April 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joseph David Daley I for party(s) Appellant Melanie A. Cissone, in case 20-10288 [20-10288] (LEF) [Entered: 04/03/2020 03:26 PM]
April 3, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10288] (David T. Wissbroecker ) [Entered: 04/03/2020 03:02 PM]
April 3, 2020 DOCUMENT RECEIVED - NO ACTION TAKEN. No action will be taken at this time on the appearance form for Kim Block received from Mr. Wissborecker because Kim Block is not a party in this appeal [20-10288] (RSM) [Entered: 04/03/2020 07:51 AM]
April 3, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Involvement terminated for Appellant Kim C. Block in 20-10288. Reason: Not party in case. [20-10288] (RSM) [Entered: 04/03/2020 07:42 AM]
March 31, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10288] (Joseph David Daley I) [Entered: 03/31/2020 12:41 PM]
March 26, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Nina Cortell for party(s) Appellee Ford Grant Nicholson Appellee Chee Keong Yap Appellee Isikeli Reuben Taureka Appellee Christopher Finlayson Appellee Wilson Kamit Appellee Michael Hession Appellee Exxon Mobil Corporation Appellee Ellis Armstrong Appellee Rabbie L. Namaliu Appellee Interoil Corporation, in case 20-10288 [20-10288] (MBC) [Entered: 03/26/2020 04:24 PM]
March 26, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Rabbie L. Namaliu in 20-10288, Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Wilson Kamit in 20-10288, Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Isikeli Reuben Taureka in 20-10288, Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Ford Grant Nicholson in 20-10288, Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Ellis Armstrong in 20-10288, Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Chee Keong Yap in 20-10288, Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Christopher Finlayson in 20-10288, Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Michael Hession in 20-10288, Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Exxon Mobil Corporation in 20-10288, Attorney Daniel H. Gold for Appellee Interoil Corporation in 20-10288 [20-10288] (MBC) [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:31 PM]
March 26, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10288] (Nina Cortell ) [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:17 PM]
March 26, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Daniel H. Gold, Esq. for Mr. Ellis Armstrong, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Mr. Christopher Finlayson, Mr. Michael Hession, Interoil Corporation, Mr. Wilson Kamit, Mr. Rabbie L. Namaliu, Mr. Ford Grant Nicholson, Mr. Isikeli Reuben Taureka and Mr. Chee Keong Yap for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10288] (Daniel H. Gold ) [Entered: 03/26/2020 01:15 PM]
March 24, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9278357-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 04/08/2020 for Appellant Melanie A. Cissone [20-10288] (CNF) [Entered: 03/24/2020 10:38 AM]
March 17, 2020 Attorney David Wissbroecker added as counsel of record for Appellant Melanie A. Cissone in 20-10288 [20-10288] (RSM) [Entered: 03/17/2020 07:38 AM]
March 17, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Melanie A. Cissone [20-10288] (RSM) [Entered: 03/17/2020 07:32 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Kim Block v. Interoil Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: MICHAEL HESSION
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: EXXON MOBIL CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHEE KEONG YAP
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIR WILSON KAMIT
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: INTEROIL CORPORATION
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: ISIKELI REUBEN TAUREKA
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: CHRISTOPHER FINLAYSON
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FORD GRANT NICHOLSON
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: DR. ELLIS ARMSTRONG
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: SIR RABBIE L. NAMALIU
Represented By: Daniel H. Gold Esq.
Represented By: Nina Cortell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: MELANIE A. CISSONE, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Joe Kendall
Represented By: David T. Wissbroecker
Represented By: Joseph David Daley I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: KIM C. BLOCK, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
Represented By: Joe Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?