Joe Byrd v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Defendant / Appellee: TEXAS CAPITAL BANK, PARAMOUNT MORTGAGE, INCORPORATED, FLAGSTAR BANK, N.A. and BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Trustee for the benefit of Alternative Loan Trust 2007-J1 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-J1
Plaintiff / Appellant: JOE W. BYRD
Case Number: 20-10291
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Walter McInnis for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon, in case 20-10291 (RAJ) [Entered: 04/23/2020 01:36 PM]
April 23, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Joe W. Byrd advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. [20-10291] Duplicate transcript was filed 4/9/20. (RAJ) [Entered: 04/23/2020 11:06 AM]
April 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Monica Summers for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon, in case 20-10291 [20-10291] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/23/2020 11:02 AM]
April 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10291] (Monica Summers ) [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:55 AM]
April 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10291] (Walter McInnis ) [Entered: 04/23/2020 09:53 AM]
April 21, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) C. Charles Townsend for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon, in case 20-10291 [20-10291] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/21/2020 08:40 AM]
April 20, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10291] (C. Charles Townsend ) [Entered: 04/20/2020 04:33 PM]
April 13, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 05/26/2020 for Appellant Joe W. Byrd. [20-10291] (DDL) [Entered: 04/13/2020 11:13 AM]
April 13, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? Yes. Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-10291] (DDL) [Entered: 04/13/2020 11:12 AM]
April 9, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 4:18-CV-70. Electronic ROA due on 04/24/2020. [20-10291] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/09/2020 12:46 PM]
April 9, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Joe W. Byrd. Transcript Order ddl satisfied. (TRANSCIRIPT UNNECCESARY FOR APPEAL PURPOSES)[20-10291] (RAJ) [Entered: 04/09/2020 12:45 PM]
March 27, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Daniel P. Troiano for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon, in case 20-10291 [20-10291] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/27/2020 08:34 AM]
March 26, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Richard Dwayne Danner for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon, in case 20-10291 [20-10291] (RAJ) [Entered: 03/26/2020 12:43 PM]
March 26, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10291] (Daniel P. Troiano ) [Entered: 03/26/2020 10:29 AM]
March 26, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10291] (Richard Dwayne Danner ) [Entered: 03/26/2020 09:59 AM]
March 24, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9278975-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. Transcript order due on 04/08/2020 for Appellant Joe W. Byrd [20-10291] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/24/2020 04:11 PM]
March 24, 2020 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 03/17/2020 granting IFP for Appellant Mr. Joe W. Byrd. [20-10291] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/24/2020 04:10 PM]
March 17, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Joe W. Byrd [20-10291] (WMJ) [Entered: 03/17/2020 02:09 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Joe Byrd v. Bank of New York Mellon, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: TEXAS CAPITAL BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: PARAMOUNT MORTGAGE, INCORPORATED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: FLAGSTAR BANK, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON, formerly known as Trustee for the benefit of Alternative Loan Trust 2007-J1 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-J1
Represented By: Barry A. McCain
Represented By: Cody Patrick Peterson Esq.
Represented By: C. Charles Townsend Esq.
Represented By: Monica Summers
Represented By: Richard Dwayne Danner
Represented By: Daniel P. Troiano
Represented By: Walter McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: JOE W. BYRD
Represented By: Joe W. Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?