Med-Cert Home Care, L.L.C. v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary, et al
Defendant / Appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and SEEMA VERMA, Administrator for Centers for Medicare and Medicaid
Plaintiff / Appellee: MED-CERT HOME CARE, L.L.C.
Case Number: 20-10443
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Exhibits on File in District Court? No. [20-10443] (DDL) [Entered: 06/01/2020 04:15 PM]
May 29, 2020 COURT ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that appellant's unopposed motion to stay further proceedings in this court pending a decision in Sahara Health Care, Inc. v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary, et al, Case No. 18-41120, is GRANTED. [ # 9314968-2 ] [20-10443] (CAS) [Entered: 05/29/2020 04:57 PM]
May 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Mark E. Price for Appellee Med-Cert Home Care, L.L.C. in 20-10443 [20-10443] (MVM) [Entered: 05/19/2020 11:41 AM]
May 18, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED FROM DISTRICT COURT for 3:18-CV-2372. Electronic ROA due on 06/02/2020. [20-10443] (MVM) [Entered: 05/18/2020 03:10 PM]
May 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Mark E. Price for Med-Cert Home Care, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10443] (Mark E. Price ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 01:29 PM]
May 18, 2020 UNOPPOSED MOTION filed by Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Ms. Seema Verma to stay further proceedings in this court. Reason: pending disposition of substantially the same question in Sahara Health Care v. Azar, No. 18-41120 (5th Cir.). Date of service: 05/18/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Delaney, Salzman; Attorney for Appellee: Price [20-10443] (Joshua Marc Salzman ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 09:25 AM]
May 18, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Transcript Order ddl satisfied [20-10443] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Ms. Seema Verma advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 05/18/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Delaney, Salzman; Attorney for Appellee: Price [20-10443] (Joshua Marc Salzman ) [Entered: 05/18/2020 08:57 AM]
May 18, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Joshua Marc Salzman for party(s) Appellant Seema Verma Appellant Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services, in case 20-10443 [20-10443] (MVM) [Entered: 05/18/2020 07:20 AM]
May 15, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10443] (Joshua Marc Salzman ) [Entered: 05/15/2020 09:53 AM]
May 15, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9313922-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/01/2020 for Appellants Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Seema Verma [20-10443] (MVM) [Entered: 05/15/2020 07:44 AM]
May 8, 2020 US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary, U.S. Department of Health and Human Services and Ms. Seema Verma [20-10443] (LEF) [Entered: 05/08/2020 08:33 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Med-Cert Home Care, L.L.C. v. Alex Azar, II, Secretary, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: ALEX M. AZAR, II, SECRETARY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellant: SEEMA VERMA, Administrator for Centers for Medicare and Medicaid
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Delaney
Represented By: Joshua Marc Salzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellee: MED-CERT HOME CARE, L.L.C.
Represented By: Mark E. Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?