William Burch v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation, et al
Appellee: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C., MARK W. STOUT, MICHAEL WEEMS, PADFIELD & STOUT, L.L.P., FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION, HUGHES WATERS ASKANASE, HOMEWARD RESIDENTIAL, INCORPORATED and OCWEN LOAN SERVICING COMPANY
Appellant: WILLIAM PAUL BURCH
Case Number: 20-10498
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other

Opinions

We have the following opinions for this case:

Date Filed Description
January 8, 2021 Burch v. Freedom Mortgage, et al

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9323166-2] Parties added: Appellee Ocwen Loan Servicing Company. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch. [9323166-1] [20-10498] (AS) [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:39 PM]
May 29, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9323150-2] NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch. [9323150-1] [20-10498] (AS) [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:23 PM]
May 29, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9323145-2] Parties added: Appellee Homeward Residential, Incorporated. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch. [9323145-1] [20-10498] (AS) [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:19 PM]
May 29, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9323134-2] Parties added: Appellees Hughes Waters Askanase, Michael Weems, Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C., Padfield & Stout, L.L.P. and Mark W. Stout. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch. [9323134-1] [20-10498] (AS) [Entered: 05/29/2020 12:07 PM]
May 28, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9323100-2] Parties added: Appellee JP Morgan Chase Bank National Association. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch. [9323100-1] [20-10498] (AS) [Entered: 05/29/2020 11:45 AM]
May 27, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9320931-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee due on 06/11/2020 for Appellant William Paul Burch [20-10498] (CB) [Entered: 05/27/2020 11:12 AM]
May 22, 2020 BANKRUPTCY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. William Paul Burch [20-10498] (LEF) [Entered: 05/22/2020 11:43 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: William Burch v. Freedom Mortgage Corporation, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By: William Lance Lewis Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles Edwin Harrell Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MARK W. STOUT
Represented By: Charles Edwin Harrell Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: MICHAEL WEEMS
Represented By: Charles Edwin Harrell Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PADFIELD & STOUT, L.L.P.
Represented By: Charles Edwin Harrell Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FREEDOM MORTGAGE CORPORATION
Represented By: Sam David Smith Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HUGHES WATERS ASKANASE
Represented By: Charles Edwin Harrell Esq. Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HOMEWARD RESIDENTIAL, INCORPORATED
Represented By: Robert Thompson Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING COMPANY
Represented By: Robert Thompson Mowrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: WILLIAM PAUL BURCH
Represented By: William Paul Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?