Lorita Davis, et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C., et al
Defendant / Appellee: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C. and BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, N.A., As successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, as Trustee for Residential Asset Securities Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass Through Certificates Series 2004-KS2, formerly known as Bank of New Y
Plaintiff / Appellant: DESI ARNEZ DAVIS and LORITA DAVIS
Case Number: 20-10547
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 08/03/2020 for Appellants Desi Arnez Davis and Lorita Davis. [20-10547] (CMB) [Entered: 06/24/2020 01:12 PM]
June 24, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL FILED. Admitted Exhibits on File in District Court? No. Video/Audio Exhibits on File in District Court? No Electronic ROA deadline satisfied. [20-10547] (CMB) [Entered: 06/24/2020 01:09 PM]
June 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) David M. Vereeke for party(s) Appellant Lorita Davis Appellant Desi Arnez Davis, in case 20-10547 [20-10547] (MBC) [Entered: 06/23/2020 01:01 PM]
June 23, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Jack B. Peacock Jr. for Appellant Desi Arnez Davis in 20-10547, Attorney Jack B. Peacock Jr. for Appellant Lorita Davis in 20-10547 [20-10547] (MBC) [Entered: 06/23/2020 12:52 PM]
June 19, 2020 ELECTRONIC RECORD ON APPEAL REQUESTED from District Court for 3:18-CV-2720. Electronic ROA due on 07/06/2020. [20-10547] (MBC) [Entered: 06/19/2020 04:27 PM]
June 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Adam Ross Nunnallee for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. Appellee Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C., in case 20-10547 [20-10547] (MBC) [Entered: 06/19/2020 02:21 PM]
June 19, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellants Mr. Desi Arnez Davis and Ms. Lorita Davis advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes. Date of Service: 06/19/2020 via email - Attorney for Appellees: Kratovil, Marquis; Attorney for Appellant: Peacock [20-10547] (Jack B. Peacock Jr.) [Entered: 06/19/2020 01:22 PM]
June 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Mr. Jack B. Peacock, Jr. for Mr. Desi Arnez Davis and Ms. Lorita Davis for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10547] (Jack B. Peacock Jr.) [Entered: 06/19/2020 01:20 PM]
June 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10547] (David M. Vereeke ) [Entered: 06/19/2020 01:16 PM]
June 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney(s) Christopher D. Kratovil for party(s) Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. Appellee Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C., in case 20-10547 [20-10547] (MBC) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:21 PM]
June 19, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM FILED by Attorney Amelia Marquis for Appellee Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. in 20-10547, Attorney Amelia Marquis for Appellee Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C. in 20-10547 [20-10547] (MBC) [Entered: 06/19/2020 12:17 PM]
June 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10547] (Adam Ross Nunnallee ) [Entered: 06/17/2020 05:26 PM]
June 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM received from Ms. Amelia Marquis for Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C. for the court's review. Lead Counsel? No. [20-10547] (Amelia Marquis ) [Entered: 06/17/2020 05:07 PM]
June 17, 2020 APPEARANCE FORM for the court's review. Lead Counsel? Yes. [20-10547] (Christopher D. Kratovil ) [Entered: 06/17/2020 04:40 PM]
June 9, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9330234-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 06/24/2020 for Appellants Desi Arnez Davis and Lorita Davis [20-10547] (CB) [Entered: 06/09/2020 07:58 AM]
June 4, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Desi Arnez Davis and Ms. Lorita Davis [20-10547] (RAJ) [Entered: 06/04/2020 03:01 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Lorita Davis, et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: OCWEN LOAN SERVICING, L.L.C.
Represented By: Amelia Marquis
Represented By: Adam Ross Nunnallee
Represented By: Christopher D. Kratovil Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON TRUST COMPANY, N.A., As successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, as Trustee for Residential Asset Securities Corporation, Home Equity Mortgage Asset-Backed Pass Through Certificates Series 2004-KS2, formerly known as Bank of New Y
Represented By: Amelia Marquis
Represented By: Adam Ross Nunnallee
Represented By: Christopher D. Kratovil Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: DESI ARNEZ DAVIS
Represented By: Jack B. Peacock Jr.
Represented By: David M. Vereeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: LORITA DAVIS
Represented By: Jack B. Peacock Jr.
Represented By: David M. Vereeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?