James Parker v. Vince Guthrie, et al
Defendant / Appellee: Randy Guthrie, FBI, Vince Guthrie, United States Marshall, Brad Livingston, Executive Director, Dustin Lee Pearce, United States Marshall and Joshua McAlister, United States Marshall
Plaintiff / Appellant: James Ray Parker
Case Number: 20-10945
Filed: September 14, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9433508-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied. [20-10945] (CAS) [Entered: 11/02/2020 12:31 PM]
October 23, 2020 CASE CAPTION updated. Additional appeal filed. [9427779-2] NOA filed on 10/20/20 by Appellant Mr. James Ray Parker. [9427779-1] [20-10945] (MVM) [Entered: 10/23/2020 09:10 AM]
October 20, 2020 FORWARDING MOTION for IFP received from Appellant Mr. James Ray Parker to the District Court for filing.Fee deadline canceled. [20-10945] (CNF) [Entered: 10/20/2020 02:20 PM]
September 21, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9404607-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Fee or motion for IFP in DC due on 11/16/2020 for Appellant James Ray Parker [20-10945] (MRW) [Entered: 09/21/2020 04:16 PM]
September 14, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. James Ray Parker [20-10945] (MVM) [Entered: 09/14/2020 03:45 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: James Parker v. Vince Guthrie, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Randy Guthrie, FBI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Vince Guthrie, United States Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Brad Livingston, Executive Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Dustin Lee Pearce, United States Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Joshua McAlister, United States Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: James Ray Parker
Represented By: James Ray Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?