Mtaza v. Wilkinson
Petitioner / Appellant: Amon Rweyemamu Mtaza
Respondent / Appellee: William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General, Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Matthew Albence, Acting Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Marc Moore, Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Field Office for the Northern District of Texas, Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General, David Pekoske, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting U.S. Attorney General and Pete Gaynor, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 20-11220
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties of caption update [20-11220] (AS) [Entered: 02/03/2021 11:38 AM]
February 2, 2021 UPDATED CASE PROCESSING NOTICE sent. [20-11220] (MFY) [Entered: 02/02/2021 04:15 PM]
February 2, 2021 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 01/19/2021 denying motions for reconsideration [20-11220] (MFY) [Entered: 02/02/2021 03:36 PM]
January 25, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties of revised caption [20-11220] (MFY) [Entered: 01/25/2021 08:19 AM]
January 13, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising of revised caption [20-11220] (MFY) [Entered: 01/13/2021 01:38 PM]
January 5, 2021 LETTER OF ADVISEMENT. Reason: advising parties of revised caption [20-11220] (MFY) [Entered: 01/05/2021 03:20 PM]
December 22, 2020 TRANSCRIPT ORDER received from Appellant Mr. Amon Rweyemamu Mtaza advising transcript unnecessary for appeal purposes no hearings. [20-11220] (CAS) [Entered: 12/22/2020 04:49 PM]
December 21, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process after monitoring for dc#8 and 9, motions for reconsideration. [9467438-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [20-11220] (CBW) [Entered: 12/21/2020 03:16 PM]
December 15, 2020 PRISONER CASE WITHOUT COUNSEL docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Amon Rweyemamu Mtaza [20-11220] (LEF) [Entered: 12/15/2020 08:22 AM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Mtaza v. Wilkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner / appellant: Amon Rweyemamu Mtaza
Represented By: Amon Rweyemamu Mtaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: William P. Barr, U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Chad F. Wolf, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Matthew Albence, Acting Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Marc Moore, Director, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement Field Office for the Northern District of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Alejandro Mayorkas, Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Jeffrey A. Rosen, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: David Pekoske, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Robert M. Wilkinson, Acting U.S. Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent / appellee: Pete Gaynor, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?