Wreh v. Wells Fargo Bank
Plaintiff / Appellant: J. Christopher Wreh
Defendant / Appellee: Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C.
Case Number: 20-11224
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: U.S. Court of Appeals, Fifth Circuit
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2021 DISTRICT COURT ORDER of 02/08/2021 denying IFP for Appellant Mr. J. Christopher Wreh. Fee due on 03/08/2021 for Appellant J. Christopher Wreh [20-11224] (CBW) [Entered: 02/08/2021 04:08 PM]
December 18, 2020 INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete, Action: Case OK to Process. [9466205-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. [20-11224] (CNF) [Entered: 12/18/2020 12:34 PM]
December 15, 2020 PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. J. Christopher Wreh [20-11224] (LLL) [Entered: 12/15/2020 01:41 PM]

Access additional case information on PACER

Access the Case Summary and Docket Report to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Search for this case: Wreh v. Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff / appellant: J. Christopher Wreh
Represented By: J. Christopher Wreh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Branch Masterson Sheppard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant / appellee: Specialized Loan Servicing, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?